Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01237
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Info Label, Inc.
12 Enterprise Avenue
Halfmoon, NY 12065
Represented By
Info Label, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/27 11:47 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1237 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
9 9 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 01/20 1:16 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
8 8 motion Motion, Mediation Tue 01/07 3:08 PM
Motion for Mediation // Notice of Scheduling of Mediation filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance Mon 01/06 11:24 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Francis J. Brennan on behalf of Info Label, Inc.. (Brennan, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
6 6 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 12/02 10:41 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed on 12/2/2024 Extending the Deadlines in the Avoidance Action Procedures. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 11/27 2:24 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of the Deadlines in the Avoidance Action Procedures Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/30 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/02 5:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 01/31 10:18 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/1/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/30 12:15 PM
Adversary case 24-01237 Complaint against Info Label, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/30 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01237 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16499321. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1