Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01240
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Insight Direct USA, Inc.
6820 S. Harl Avenue
Tempe, AZ 85283
Represented By
Insight Direct USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 04/01 8:28 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1240 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 03/31 1:45 PM
So Ordered Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding signed on 3/31/2025 (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 03/31 12:55 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order for Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Wed 03/05 11:39 AM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sean Southard. (Southard, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 motion Motion, Mediation Tue 01/07 3:17 PM
Motion for Mediation // Notice of Scheduling of Mediation filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 30, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/30 12:40 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 05/01 7:21 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Statement of Corporate Ownership of Insight Direct USA, Inc. . Corporate parents added to case: Insight Direct USA, Inc.. Filed by Laurel D. Roglen on behalf of Insight Direct USA, Inc.. (Roglen, Laurel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
4 4 answer None Mon 04/29 8:29 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Laurel D. Roglen on behalf of Insight Direct USA, Inc.. (Roglen, Laurel)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, February 02, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/02 6:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 01/31 10:18 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/1/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/30 12:36 PM
Adversary case 24-01240 Complaint against Insight Direct USA, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 01/30 5:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01240 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16499321. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1