Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust v. Jani-King of Southern Ontario
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-01246 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Jani-King of Southern Ontario
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 04/22 12:24 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1246 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Jani-King of Southern Ontario. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 01/31 5:20 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01246 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16499537. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-01246 Complaint against Jani-King of Southern Ontario (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |