Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-32252

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John P Gustafson
Case #: 3:24-ap-03005
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Steven N. Warren
27695 Tracy Rd. Lot 526
Walbridge, OH 43465
Represented By
Steven N. Warren
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Ann Stewart
Represented By
Gregory McLawsen
Sound Immigration
contact info

GPO Mar 04 2025
Memorandum of Decision and Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Signed on 3/4/2025 (RE: related document(s)31 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding). (sheym crt)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
42 42 BNC Notice of Order to Continue Hearing Fri 05/09 12:12 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Continue Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
41 41 order Continue Hearing Tue 05/06 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Pretrial Hearing Related [+] Signed on 5/6/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 02:45 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 40 Complaint
Monday, May 05, 2025
40 40 motion Continue Hearing Mon 05/05 11:44 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing On May 6, 2025 Filed by Jennifer Ann Stewart Related [+] (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-] 38 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
39 39 BNC Notice of Order to Continue Hearing Thu 04/10 12:36 PM
Notice of Order on Motion to Continue Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38
Monday, April 07, 2025
38 38 order Continue Hearing Mon 04/07 2:26 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Pretrial Conference Related [+] Signed on 4/7/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 01:45 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 37 Complaint
Friday, April 04, 2025
37 37 motion Continue Hearing Fri 04/04 4:55 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing On April 15, 2025 Filed by Jennifer Ann Stewart Related [+] (McLawsen, Gregory aty). Related document(s)33 Opinion and Order. Modified on 4/6/2025 to correct link (mknei)
Related: [-] 36 Notice of Order to Set Hearing
Friday, March 28, 2025
36 36 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Sat 03/29 12:13 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 03/28/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
35 35 order Set Hearing (PDF) Wed 03/26 12:03 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Re: Memorandum of Decision and Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Order to Set Hearing Signed on 3/26/2025 Related [+]. Further Pretrial Hearing scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 33 Opinion and Order
Thursday, March 06, 2025
34 34 BNC Notice of Opinion and Order Fri 03/07 12:13 AM
Notice of Opinion and Order w/ Certificate of Service Related [+] Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
33 33 16 pgs order Opinion and Order (PDF) Tue 03/04 3:25 PM
Memorandum of Decision and Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Signed on 3/4/2025 Related [+]. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 31 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
32 32 22 pgs misc Memorandum in Opposition to Tue 07/30 6:43 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Jennifer Ann Stewart Related [+]. (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-] 31
Saturday, July 27, 2024
31 31 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Sat 07/27 10:54 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Steven N. Warren (Kovacs, Patricia aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Support
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Judgment Entry
Sunday, June 23, 2024
30 30 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Mon 06/24 12:09 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29
Friday, June 21, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order (PDF) Fri 06/21 1:27 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 6/21/2024 Related [+]. Motion to Dismiss on the pleadings under Rule 12(b)(6) to be filed on, or before July 26, 2024. Plaintiffs response is to be filed on or before August 8, 2024. Defendant may request leave to Reply by August 16, 2024. If no Motion for Leave to Reply is filed by that date, matter will then be decisional. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, June 20, 2024
28 28 court Proceeding Memo Thu 06/20 3:23 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Pre-trial held. Motion to Dismiss on the pleadings under Rule 12(b)(6) to be filed on, or before, July 26,2024. Plaintiff's response is to be filed on or before August 8, 2024. Defendant may request leave to Reply by August 16, 2024. If no Motion for Leave to Reply is filed by that date, matter will then be decisional. (sheym)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, June 06, 2024
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/06 11:01 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Steven N. Warren. (Kovacs, Patricia aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
26 26 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/14 3:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Steven N. Warren 5/7/2024 (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
25 25 cmp Summons Issued Tue 05/07 9:28 AM
SECOND ALIAS SUMMONS issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Steven N. Warren Answer due 6/6/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. (mhutt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
24 24 misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Fri 05/03 5:13 PM
Second Request for Issuance of Alias Summons (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certified mailing history for first Alias Summons
Sunday, April 21, 2024
23 23 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Mon 04/22 12:09 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22
Friday, April 19, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order (PDF) Fri 04/19 4:28 PM
Order Denying Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Signed on 4/19/2024 Related [+]. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 10 Application for Entry of Default
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
21 21 cmp Summons Issued Wed 04/17 1:17 PM
ALIAS Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Steven N. Warren Answer due 5/17/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/23/2024 at 01:45 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. (mhutt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
20 20 misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Tue 04/16 4:31 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons [Corrected] (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Proceeding Memo Tue 04/16 3:48 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held. Complaint to be reserved with alias summons within 10 days. (New pre-trial date will be set on the alias summons) (sheym)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
18 18 misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Tue 04/16 2:07 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons (McLawsen, Gregory aty) Modified on 4/16/2024 NOTICE REQUIRING CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT: Wrong Case Caption on Pleading. (sheym)
Related: [-]
utility Notice Requiring Corrective Document Tue 04/16 2:32 PM
NOTICE REQUIRING CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT: Wrong Case Caption on Pleading Related [+] (sheym)
Related: [-] 18 Request for Issuance of Alias Summons
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
16 16 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/26 11:48 AM
Summons Service Executed on Steven N. Warren 3/26/2024 (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
15 15 BNC Notice of Order to Continue Hearing Fri 03/22 12:11 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Continue Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
14 14 order Continue Hearing Tue 03/19 12:39 PM
Order Denying Motion To Strike or Continue Pretrial Related [+] Signed on 3/19/2024. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, March 14, 2024
13 13 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Fri 03/15 12:14 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
12 12 order Set Hearing (PDF) Tue 03/12 4:34 PM
Order to Set Hearing on Plaintiffs Application for Entry of Default Signed on 3/12/2024 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2024 at 01:45 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 10 Application for Entry of Default
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
11 11 motion Continue Hearing Wed 03/06 3:58 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On 3/14/2004 or Strike Same Filed by Jennifer Ann Stewart Related [+] (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-] 6 Summons Issued
10 10 misc Application for Entry of Default Wed 03/06 3:32 PM
Application for Entry of Default Filed by Jennifer Ann Stewart (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/05 12:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on Patti Baumgartner-Novak 1/31/2024 (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/05 12:02 PM
Summons Service Executed on Steven N. Warren 1/31/2024 (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
7 7 BNC Notice of Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sat 02/03 12:14 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 cmp Summons Issued Wed 01/31 2:07 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Steven N. Warren Answer due 3/1/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/14/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. (mhutt)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 01/31 12:56 PM
Order Granting Amended Motion To Appear pro hac vice for Attorney Gregory H. McLawsen Related [+] Signed on 1/31/2024. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 court Notice of Filing Deficiency Wed 01/31 9:13 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency: Proposed Order not uploaded at time of filing as required by Attorney Gregory McLawsen. Upload through ECF - Adversary - "Order Upload" Related [+] (mhutt)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Monday, January 29, 2024
3 3 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 01/29 4:56 PM
Amended Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Jennifer Ann Stewart (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 01/29 4:27 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Jennifer Ann Stewart (McLawsen, Gregory aty) Modified on 1/29/2024 (mknei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/29 3:50 PM
Adversary case 24-03005 Complaint by Jennifer Ann Stewart against Steven N. Warren. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit:61 (Dischargeability [523(a)(5) Support Alimony),64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree) (McLawsen, Gregory aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Support
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Visa Petition approval
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Arrival record
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Residency Application
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Cover letter to Affidavit of Support
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Residency App approval
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Green card
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Magistrate decision
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Divorce Final Judgment