Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-30405

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:24-ap-03012
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gonzales Commercial Electric, Inc.
7700 San Felipe Street, Suite 550
Houston, TX 77063
Represented By
Marcellous S. McZeal
Grealish Mczeal PC
contact info
Defendant
Velocity Capital Group LLC d/b/a 24C
417 Rugby Road
Cedarhurst, NY 11516
Represented By
Shawn Michael Grady
Law Firm Of Shawn M. Grady, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Gulf Capital Bank
1 Riverway, Suite 150
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Annmarie Antoinette Chiarello
Winstead PC
contact info
Steffen R Sowell
Winstead PC
contact info
Phillip L Lamberson
Winstead PC
contact info
Plaintiff
BE&K Building Group, LLC
Represented By
Roger Kelly Donaldson
Fahl & Donaldson, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
court Disbursement of Registry Funds Fri 08/23 11:33 AM
Disbursement of Registry funds to Allison D. Byman, Trustee in the amount of $150,820.66 on 8/7/2024 Related [+] (khn4)
Related: [-] 16 Judgment
Friday, April 12, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/12 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Judgment
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Wed 04/10 1:32 PM
Agreed Judgment, Signed on 4/10/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Order Tue 04/09 4:30 PM
Proposed Order RE: Proposed Final Judgment (Filed By Allison Byman ) Related [+] (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, 13 Courtroom Minutes
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
14 14 audio MP3 Wed 04/03 4:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/3/2024 10:00:24 AM ]. File Size [ 5768 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:01 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Courtroom Minutes Wed 04/03 10:15 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:00 AM - 10:12 AM. Appearances: Kelly Donaldson and Mike Cramer for BE&K Building Group, LLC. Annmarie Chiarello for Gulf Capital Bank. Simon Mayer for the Ch. 7 Trustee. Rusty Woolley an interested party. The Court heard oral argument. Parties to file a final judgment within two weeks as stated on the record. Related [+] (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference
Monday, April 01, 2024
court Receipt of Interpleader Funds Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Tue 04/02 4:50 PM
Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $150,820.66 on 4/1/2024 (khn4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
12 12 misc Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney) Wed 03/27 5:30 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By BE&K Building Group, LLC ). (Fahl, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/26 5:13 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Gulf Capital Bank (Chiarello, Annmarie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 01, 2024
10 10 order Financial Order (REGARDING REGISTRY FUNDS) Fri 03/01 10:35 AM
Order Granting BE&K's Motion to Deposit Funds, Signed on 3/1/2024 Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
9 9 motion Deposit Funds into Court Registry Tue 02/27 1:42 PM
Motion to Deposit Funds into the Court Registry in Interpleader under 28 USC 1335. Filing party has no interest in interpled funds. Filed by BE&K Building Group, LLC (Fahl, Glenn) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2024 (KathyHNguyen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 12, 2024
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/12 3:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on Velocity Capital Group LLC d/b/a 24C 2/12/2024. (Fahl, Glenn)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/12 3:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on Gulf Capital Bank 1/26/2024. (Fahl, Glenn)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Mon 02/12 3:23 PM
Notice Service of Court's Order . Filed by BE&K Building Group, LLC(Fahl, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Saturday, February 03, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/03 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Thu 02/01 9:55 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 01/30 12:44 PM
Summons Issued on Gonzales Commercial Electric, Inc. Date Issued 1/30/2024. (RhondaMooreKonieczny)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Mon 01/29 5:14 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Gonzales Commercial Electric, Inc.. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 01/29 5:12 PM
Adversary case 24-03012 Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Complaint by BE&K Building Group, LLC against Gonzales Commercial Electric, Inc. , Velocity Capital Group LLC d/b/a 24C , Gulf Capital Bank . Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]