Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Joe Heaton
Case #: 5:24-cv-00108
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Case in other court:Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-00199
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 5:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By
Galen L Brittingham
Atkinson Brittingham Gladd Fiasco Edmonds & Annis
contact info
Carol J Allen
Atkinson Haskins Nellis Holemen Phipps Brittingham
contact info
Andrew G Wakeman
Atkinson, Brittingham, Gladd, Fiasco & Edmonds
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Brower
Represented By
Susan F Kane
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info
Matthew C Kane
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info
Gerard F Pignato
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Sunday, July 07, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Sun 07/07 11:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT) by Mark Brower. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 06/11 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Wakeman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
25 25 trial Witness List Wed 05/29 1:57 PM
Witness List Plaintiff's Witness List by Plaintiff Mark Brower. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Subpoena Wed 05/29 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Subpoena by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company Riteway Roofing & Construction (Wakeman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
23 23 motion Compel Tue 05/21 4:43 PM
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Documents From Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company by Mark Brower.(Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Def Allstate's Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests
Monday, May 20, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Subpoena Mon 05/20 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Subpoena by Mark Brower(Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Pilot SDT,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Patriot SDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
21 21 trial Witness List - Expert Wed 05/15 1:53 PM
Expert Witness List Plaintiff's Expert Witness List by Plaintiff Mark Brower. (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
20 20 order Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/17 11:01 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting19 defendant's unopposed motion for entry of agreed protective order. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 04/17/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
19 19 motion Protective Order Tue 04/16 3:17 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Wakeman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/05 10:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 09/15/2024; Jury instructions due 09/15/2024; Voir dire requests due 09/15/2024; Trial briefs due 09/15/2024. ADR Completion Date due by 6/15/2024. Discovery due by 7/1/2024. Jury Trial set on the court's 10/2024 trial docket in Courtroom 501 before Judge Joe Heaton. Motions due by 7/15/2024. Pretrial Report due by 9/15/2024. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 03/05/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 03/05 10:23 AM
ORDER striking the 03/06/2024 scheduling conference. The court orders this case to Mediation and directed to select a mediator, conduct mediation, and advise the court of the results thereof by 06/15/2024. A scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 03/05/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
16 16 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Thu 02/15 3:18 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Allen, Carol)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
15 15 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 02/12 11:17 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Susan F Kane on behalf of Mark Brower (Kane, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
14 14 misc Docket Thu 02/08 2:59 PM
CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference is set for 03/06/2024 @ 10:40 AM in Chambers (Room 2301) before Judge Joe Heaton. The Joint Status Report and Joint Discovery Plan is due by 02/26/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 02/05 4:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Allen, Carol)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate Wed 01/31 2:42 PM
CERTIFICATE of Receipt of Notice and Notice of Removal . (Brittingham, Galen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Tue 01/30 4:09 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company . (Allen, Carol)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 01/30 3:49 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew G Wakeman on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Wakeman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 01/30 3:46 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Carol J Allen on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Allen, Carol)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 01/30 3:44 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Galen L Brittingham on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Brittingham, Galen)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 01/30 3:17 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew C Kane on behalf of Mark Brower (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 01/30 3:06 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Gerard F Pignato on behalf of Mark Brower (Pignato, Gerard)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order for Response Tue 01/30 2:47 PM
ENTER ORDER directing counsel for the parties to file entries of appearance not later than 02/01/2024. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 01/30/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ~Notice (other) Tue 01/30 2:43 PM
NOTICE (other) by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company To Parties of Removal (Brittingham, Galen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Affidavit Tue 01/30 2:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Brittingham, Galen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Jury Demand Tue 01/30 2:39 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Brittingham, Galen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 01/30 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District, case number CJ-2024-199 filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(cps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - EOA for Susan Kane,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - EOA for Gerard Pignato and Matthew Kane,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Tue 01/30 2:34 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4347135. (Brittingham, Galen)
Related: [-]