Oregon District Court
Judge:Marco A Hernandez
Case #: 3:24-cv-00199
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 4:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Burlingame Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Conner Slevin
an individual 7051 NE 7th Place
Portland, OR 97211
Represented By
David Scott Foster
The Law Office Of David S Foster PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 15, 2024
order Dismissal - Case Fri 03/15 12:00 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal5 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
5 5 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Thu 03/14 9:40 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by Conner Slevin. (Foster, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
4 4 oth_evt Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT Mon 02/05 9:42 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael H. Simon to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/30 3:39 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Burlingame Group, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Tue 01/30 3:37 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/29/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/28/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/28/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/30 2:53 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9256811 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Conner Slevin against Burlingame Group, LLC. (Foster, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet