Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Henry W Van Eck
Case #: 1:24-bk-00219
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 06, 2024

Debtor
George Strohm Jr. Inc.
480 Vine Street
Lebanon, PA 17042
Represented By
Robert E Chernicoff
Cunningham And Chernicoff PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102
Trustee
Steven M. Carr
Ream Carr Markey Woloshin & Hunter LLP (Trustee) 119 East Market Street
York, PA 17401


Docket last updated: 01/31/2024 12:03 AM EST
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Tue 01/30 4:45 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:24-bk-00219] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A10948361, amount $ 338.00. Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 01/30 4:44 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 338.00 Filed by Robert E Chernicoff of Cunningham and Chernicoff PC on behalf of George Strohm Jr. Inc.. (Chernicoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Tue 01/30 10:01 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Trustee Carr, Steven M. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/6/2024 at 01:30 PM - w/Trustee Carr join.zoom.us Meeting ID 259 203 5896, passcode 0745051560, Phone 1-267-552-4893. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]