New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Case #: 2:24-cv-00676
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 6:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Chandra C. Bowen
Represented By
Deke Shearon
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
Calvin Spellmon, Jr.
Represented By
Deke Shearon
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
Perfect Body Laser And Wellness, LLC
Represented By
Deke Shearon
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Plaintiff
Perfect Body Image, LLC
Represented By
Todd Wengrovsky
Todd Wengrovsky
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 31, 2024
utility Transfer Case Opened Fri 05/31 4:51 PM
Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in in Northern District of Alabama as case 2:24-cv-00705, filed 05/31/2024. (GO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
order Order on Motion to Change Venue Tue 05/28 3:30 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's motion at DE20 to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court may immediately transfer this case given Defendants' consent thereto. See DE12 at 4 ("[V]enue would be proper in the Northern District of Alabama, where defendants reside and where a substantial part of the events giving rise to Plaintiff's claim took place."); see also Local Civ. R. 83.1 Related [+]. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/28/2024. (CB)
Related: [-] quiring the Clerk of the Court to effectuate a transfer of a case to another district after seven days "unless otherwise ordered"
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Tue 05/28 3:55 PM
Case transferred to District of Northern District of Alabama. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (LF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
20 20 motion Change Venue Fri 05/24 8:31 AM
MOTION to Change Venue / Letter Motion Regarding Transfer by Perfect Body Image, LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 05/13 10:10 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE18 Motion to Adjourn Conference. On consent and based on the representations in DE18 , the initial conference previously scheduled for 5/14/2024 is adjourned to 5/30/2024 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/13/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
19 19 minutes Pre Motion Conference Mon 05/13 3:20 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: Civil Cause for PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 5/10/2024. Appearances: For Plaintiff: Todd Wengrovsky; For Defendants: Deke Shearon. Case called. Counsel present for all sides. Other: Counsel to advise the Court how they wish to proceed within two weeks. (FTR Log #11:39-41.) (LC)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 05/10 4:46 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Perfect Body Image, LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 04/30 9:38 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The in-person Pre Motion Conference is rescheduled for 5/10/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/30/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
17 17 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 04/29 5:40 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Perfect Body Image, LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 04/03 9:43 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE16 Motion to Adjourn Conference. On consent, the initial conference previously scheduled for 4/9/2024 is adjourned to 5/14/2024 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/3/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
16 16 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 04/02 12:17 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently set for April 8, 2024, in light of Pre-Motion Conference now set for May 8, 2024 by Chandra C. Bowen, Perfect Body Laser And Wellness, LLC, Calvin Spellmon, Jr. (Shearon, Deke)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 03/25 11:42 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. However, the Court is unavailable on the proposed dates. The Pre Motion conference is rescheduled for 5/8/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/25/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
15 15 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 03/22 8:38 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Perfect Body Image, LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 03/21 3:06 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A Pre-Motion conference is set for 4/16/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack and will be held by telephone. Counsel shall dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 4785432 at the prompt. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/21/2024. (LP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
14 14 respoth Reply in Opposition Wed 03/13 8:55 AM
REPLY in Opposition re12 MOTION for pre motion conference re: Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss filed by Perfect Body Image, LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 03/07 10:11 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE13 Motion to Adjourn Conference. On consent, the initial conference previously scheduled for 3/19/2024 is adjourned to 4/9/2024 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/7/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
13 13 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 03/06 5:53 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Perfect Body Image, LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 03/06 4:22 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference re: Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss by Chandra C. Bowen, Perfect Body Laser And Wellness, LLC, Calvin Spellmon, Jr. (Shearon, Deke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/05 2:45 PM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 3/19/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/5/2024. (KG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Wed 02/28 12:06 PM
LETTER dated 2/28/2024 from K. Santana to pro se litigant. The enclosed document is being returned without docketing or consideration for the following reason(s). Our records indicated that you are represented by an attorney. As such, you may not file papers or communicate directly with the Court. Please refer this matter to your attorney. (LC)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Wed 02/28 9:30 AM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (JM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/28 9:39 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Tue 02/27 3:22 PM
Letter Letter pursuant to Administrative Order No. 2023-23 re: Direct Assignment of Civil Cases to Magistrate Judges by Chandra C. Bowen, Perfect Body Laser And Wellness, LLC, Calvin Spellmon, Jr (Shearon, Deke)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/27 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Deke Shearon on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Shearon, Deke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/22 4:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perfect Body Image, LLC. Chandra C. Bowen served on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/22 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perfect Body Image, LLC. Perfect Body Laser And Wellness, LLC served on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 01/31 2:10 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120 Wed 01/31 2:05 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Trademark. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Wed 01/31 2:02 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 01/31 1:34 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/31 2:01 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/30 6:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17517644 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Perfect Body Image, LLC, Perfect Body Laser and Aesthetics. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet