Alabama Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00030
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2024 1:16 AM CST
Defendant
Residence (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Terrill
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/31/2024 1:43 AM CST
Monday, January 29, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson,In Camera Hearing as to Residence held on 1/29/2024. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (tgw)
Related: [-]