Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Timothy W Dore
Case #: 2:24-bk-10211
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jun 18, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Shen Zen Tea, LLC
5416 Shilshole Ave NW
Seattle, WA 98107-4022
Represented By
Thomas D Neeleman
Neeleman Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
100 100 misc Proof of Service Wed 04/30 8:58 AM
Proof of Service re Motion to Dismiss (notice sent on 4/30/25) . Filed by Jennifer L Neeleman on behalf of Shen Zen Tea LLC. Related [+]. (Neeleman, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 98 Motion to Dismiss Ch 7 11 12 9,99 Declaration
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
99 99 ans Declaration Tue 04/29 3:09 PM
Declaration of James Chang in Support of Motion to Dismiss Related [+]... Filed by Jennifer L Neeleman of Neeleman Law Group, P.C. on behalf of Shen Zen Tea LLC. (Neeleman, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 98 Motion to Dismiss Ch 7 11 12 9
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Assets
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Secured Creditors
98 98 motion Dismiss Case (Ch 7 or 11 or 12 or 9) Tue 04/29 3:06 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Cause ... Filed by Jennifer L Neeleman on behalf of Shen Zen Tea LLC The Hearing date is set for 5/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at Judge Dore's Seattle Courtroom 8106, U.S. Courthouse. Response due by 5/16/2025. (Neeleman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Hearing
Att: 2 Proposed Order