Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 1:24-cv-00034
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 3:27 AM CDT
Claimant
Ruby Dang
Ruby Dang, Claimant MOORE LANDREY, LLP 905 Orleans St
Beaumont, TX 77701
Represented By
Tommy Lee Yeates
Moore Landrey, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
P&B Marine, LLC
Represented By
Michael Keith Eaves
Calvert Eaves Clarke & Stelly, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Sealed Motion Mon 05/12 3:50 PM
ORDER granting25 Sealed Motion to Release Funds. The clerk is instructed to release a check in the amount of $1000.00 to Calvert Eaves Clarke & Stelly, L.L.P.. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 05/12/2025. (SCM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
25 25 motion Sealed Motion Wed 05/07 3:54 PM
SEALED MOTION for Request for Release of Security Bond by Michael K. Eaves, Esq. on behalf of P&B Marine, LLC. (SMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/27 4:29 PM
FINAL TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT and ORDER granting dismissal with prejudice re23 Motion for Judgment. All attorneys' fees and costs will be borne by the party incurring same, and all court dates/deadlines are vacated. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/27/25. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/25 2:14 PM
AGREED MOTION for Final Take-Nothing Judgment and Entry of Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by P&B Marine, LLC.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/25 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (KMR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Wed 12/11 9:51 AM
ORDER setting Status Conference for 5/2/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. The parties are required to attend in person. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 12/10/24. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
minutes Status Conference Mon 12/09 3:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Status Conference held on 12/9/2024 from 2:20 PM - 3:00 PM. Court will set further Status Conference approximately 05/2025 to determine status of state court case. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Eaves; Defense - Tommy Yeates. (Court Reporter - Not Recorded) (KMR)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Mon 06/17 12:29 PM
ORDER setting Status Conference for 12/9/2024 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/14/24. (tkd)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Fri 06/14 3:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 6/14/2024 from 2:58 PM - 3:30 PM. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Eaves; Defense - Tommy Yeates. (Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (KMR)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
19 19 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 06/10 9:06 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 05/03 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling/Case Management Conference RESET for 6/14/2024 at 03:00 PM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (KMR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Mon 04/29 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ruby Dang(Yeates, Tommy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s) Claimant's Mandatory Initial Disclosure
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Lifting Stay ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 04/23 11:43 AM
ORDER LIFTING STAY granting the16 Corrected Unopposed Motion to Lift Stay Order. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/23/24. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/22 12:07 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Lift Stay Order Unopposed by Ruby Dang.(Yeates, Tommy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Unopposed Order Lifting Stay
Thursday, April 18, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation Thu 04/18 3:05 PM
STIPULATION in support of motion to lift stay order by Ruby Dang. (Yeates, Tommy)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/18 3:02 PM
MOTION to Lift Stay Order by Ruby Dang. (Yeates, Tommy)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Deficiency Fri 04/19 9:15 AM
Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to 14 Motion to Lift Stay Order filed by Ruby Dang. - LR CV-7(a) and CR-47(a) require motions, responses, and replies to be in searchable PDF format. Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile with the word Corrected in the title of the document. The filer should use the same ECF event and when offered the docket text enhancement dropdown, select CORRECTED so it will also appear in the docket text. Additionally, this document has no certificate of conference as required by Local Rule CV-7(i) and no proposed order per Local Rule CV-7(a). Finally the attorney signature needs /s/ added before the typed attorney's name. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/02 10:56 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Proof of Publication of Legal Notice by P&B Marine, LLC(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Publisher's Affidavit and Proof of Publication
Monday, April 01, 2024
12 12 7 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Tue 04/02 10:46 AM
ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 4/19/2024. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/1/24. (tkd)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/01 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Proof of Publication of Legal Notice by P&B Marine, LLC(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 21, 2024
10 10 respoth Response to Non-Motion Thu 03/21 4:39 PM
RESPONSE to9 Answer to Complaint Claim of Ruby Dang filed by P&B Marine, LLC . (Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 03/20 11:57 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/19 12:35 PM
Ruby Dang's Claim and ANSWER to1 Complaint, for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability of P&B Marine, LLC, as Owner/Operator of the F/V Capt. Scott by Ruby Dang.(Yeates, Tommy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
utility Remark Fri 03/01 11:00 AM
***Issued receipt #100021915 in the amount of $1,000 for deposit into the registry of the court pursuant to8 Order (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Fri 02/02 4:36 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to deposit funds into registry. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/2/24. cc: finance dept 2/2/24 (tkd, )
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/02 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. Signed by Deputy Clerk of Court 2/2/2024/ (tkd, )
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/02 4:33 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to approve notice of complaint of exoneration from and/or limitation of liability. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/2/24. (tkd, )
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/02 4:27 PM
ORDER approving limitation petitioner's stipulation of value, directing issuance of notice to claimants, and restraining the prosecution of claims granting2 Motion. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/2/24. (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/01 10:43 AM
Case reassigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 02/01 10:44 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
4 4 motion Deposit Funds Wed 01/31 11:17 AM
MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Registry by P&B Marine, LLC.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/31 11:16 AM
MOTION to Approve the Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability re1 Complaint, by P&B Marine, LLC.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Complaint fro Exoneratino from and/or Limitation of Liability,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/31 11:11 AM
MOTION to Approve Order of Limitation and Petitioner's Stipluation of Value, Direct the Issuance of Notice, and Restrain the Prosecution of Claims by P&B Marine, LLC.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability against P&B Marine, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-9950475.), filed by P&B Marine, LLC.(Eaves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Condition and Valuation Survey,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Pending Freight,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Stipulation of Value,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet