Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01260
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
VMED O2 UK Limited
Represented By
VMED O2 UK Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/09 11:24 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1260 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 04/07 11:59 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 09/25 4:43 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 02/14 11:48 AM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against VMED O2 UK Limited Answer Due: 3/15/2024. (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/30 1:48 PM
Adversary case 24-01260 Complaint against VMED O2 UK Limited (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A