Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01278
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.
300 Industry Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15275
Represented By
Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
15 15 motion Motion, Vacate Tue 04/08 12:31 PM
Motion to Vacate Default Judgment filed by Beverly Weiss Manne on behalf of Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. with hearing to be held on 5/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ). (Manne, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service
Friday, April 04, 2025
14 14 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 3:32 PM
Order Signed on 4/4/2025 Admitting Beverly Weiss Manne to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 04/03 4:06 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Beverly Weiss Manne on behalf of Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Manne, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 04/03 4:07 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 24-01278 dsj] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17025560. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #13
Thursday, February 27, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Fri 02/28 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 02/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/27 10:53 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1278 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 misc PDF Notice Mon 02/24 6:09 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 order Judgment Mon 02/24 6:09 PM
Judgment signed on 2/24/2025. Judgment entered that the the Plaintiff, Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust be awarded a default judgment against the Defendant, Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C., in a total judgment of $37,542.68. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 25,0025 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 order Motion, Default Judgment Thu 02/20 2:09 PM
Order signed on 2/20/2025 Granting Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. (Rouzeau, Anatin) Modified To Correct Signature Date on 2/20/2025 (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Tue 02/18 4:24 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Related [+] Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 01/14 10:26 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 2/12/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Friday, November 15, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 11/16 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 11/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
5 5 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 11/13 11:17 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
4 4 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 11/06 1:09 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/06 12:10 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 01/31 10:18 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/1/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/30 2:21 PM
Adversary case 24-01278 Complaint against Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B