Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01287
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Zero Wait-State, Inc.
6207 Bee Cave Road Ste 260
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Zero Wait-State, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/26 5:00 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1287 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Mon 02/24 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 02/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 misc PDF Notice Fri 02/21 5:14 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 order Judgment Fri 02/21 5:14 PM
Judgment signed on 2/21/2025. Judgment entered that the Plaintiff, Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust, be awarded a default judgment against the Defendant, Zero Wait-State, Inc., in a total judgment of $13,850.00. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 25,0016 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 order Motion, Default Judgment Thu 02/20 1:46 PM
Order signed on 2/19/2025 Granting Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Tue 02/18 4:35 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Related [+] Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 motion Motion, Default Judgment Tue 01/14 11:15 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 2/12/2025, (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Certification of Service
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 11/21 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 11/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Monday, November 18, 2024
5 5 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 11/18 11:19 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Zero Wait-State, Inc. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
4 4 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 11/06 1:24 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust.(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Friday, February 02, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/02 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 01/31 10:18 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/1/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/30 2:48 PM
Adversary case 24-01287 Complaint against Zero Wait-State, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A