Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10784

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:24-ap-01292
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kroger Packaging, Inc.
215-M Central Avenue
East Farmingdale, NY 11735
Represented By
Kroger Packaging, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 03/24 9:44 AM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 3/24/2025 Voluntarily Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 8
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/24 9:46 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1292 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 03/17 12:44 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order for Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Wed 03/12 6:09 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sean Southard. (Southard, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 motion Motion, Mediation Tue 01/07 3:18 PM
Motion for Mediation // Notice of Scheduling of Mediation filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 30, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/30 12:44 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
4 4 answer None Wed 04/24 1:37 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Joel Shafferman on behalf of Kroger Packaging, Inc..(Shafferman, Joel)
Related: [-] 1 1 ,2
Att: 1 Pleading Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/06 12:16 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 01/31 10:18 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/1/2024, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/30 3:23 PM
Adversary case 24-01292 Complaint against Kroger Packaging, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Old Revco GUC Liquidating Trust. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B