Oregon District Court
Judge:Ann L Aiken
Case #: 6:24-cv-00205
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Case in other court:Benton County, 24CV03484
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Corvallis
Represented By
Kenneth S. Montoya
Montoya Law LLC
contact info
Amanda Reilly
Montoya Law
contact info
Jordan Pahl
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Kerry J. Shepherd
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charlyn Ellis
Represented By
Jesse Buss
contact info
Thomas M. Christ
Sussman Shank, LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2025
OPINION AND ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed on 1/10/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
GPO Jan 10 2025
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 15 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 10 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed on 1/10/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
27 27 notice Settlement Notice Fri 01/24 10:51 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Buss, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
26 26 order Judgment Fri 01/10 8:30 AM
JUDGMENT: Judgment is entered for Plaintiff. Signed on 1/10/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
Related: [-]
25 25 35 pgs order Opinion and Order Fri 01/10 8:27 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment15 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment10 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed on 1/10/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
Related: [-]
24 24 13 pgs order Opinion and Order Fri 01/10 8:24 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed on 1/10/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
23 23 notice Attorney Association Fri 10/18 11:01 AM
Notice of Association of Attorney of Kelsie Gene Crippen appearing on behalf of City of Corvallis . Filed by on behalf of City of Corvallis. (Crippen, Kelsie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
22 22 notice Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 06/06 1:06 PM
Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Jordan Pahl Filed by City of Corvallis. (Pahl, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
21 21 resp Reply to Motion Thu 05/16 1:23 PM
Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion 15 oral argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Buss, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
20 20 oth_sup Declaration Thu 05/02 2:44 PM
Declaration of James K. Brewer . Filed by City of Corvallis. Related [+] (Shepherd, Kerry)
Related: [-] Response in Opposition to Motion,18 .
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
19 19 oth_sup Declaration Thu 05/02 2:42 PM
Declaration of Mark W. Shephard P.E. . Filed by City of Corvallis. Related [+] (Shepherd, Kerry)
Related: [-] Response in Opposition to Motion,18 .
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
18 18 resp Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/02 2:38 PM
Response in Opposition REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion 15 , Motion for Summary Judgment 10 . Filed by City of Corvallis. (Shepherd, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
17 17 oth_sup Declaration Thu 04/11 4:34 PM
Declaration of Jesse A. Buss in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by Charlyn Ellis. Related [+] (Buss, Jesse)
Related: [-] Motion for Summary Judgment15 .
16 16 oth_sup Declaration Thu 04/11 4:33 PM
Declaration of Charlyn Ellis in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by Charlyn Ellis. Related [+] (Buss, Jesse)
Related: [-] Motion for Summary Judgment15 .
Att: 1 Exhibit Expulsion Resolution,
Att: 2 Exhibit Joint Declaration
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Thu 04/11 4:26 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Charlyn Ellis. (Buss, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 06, 2024
14 14 notice Attorney Association Sat 04/06 2:54 PM
Notice of Association of Attorney of Jesse Buss, Thomas M. Christ appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs . Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Buss, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
12 12 oth_doc Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule Tue 03/26 10:25 AM
Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Buss, Jesse)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Scheduling Tue 03/26 10:37 AM
Scheduling Order. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule12 and adopts the proposed schedule as follows: Plaintiff's response and cross-motion for summary judgment is due by 4/11/2024. Defendant's reply and response is due by 5/2/2024. Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/16/2024. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
11 11 oth_sup Declaration Thu 03/07 5:12 PM
Declaration of Kerry Shepherd . Filed by City of Corvallis. Related [+] (Shepherd, Kerry)
Related: [-] Motion for Summary Judgment10 .
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3,
Att: 9 Exhibit 4,
Att: 10 Exhibit 5,
Att: 11 Exhibit 6,
Att: 12 Exhibit 7,
Att: 13 Exhibit 8,
Att: 14 Exhibit 9,
Att: 15 Exhibit 10,
Att: 16 Exhibit 11,
Att: 17 Exhibit 12,
Att: 18 Exhibit 13,
Att: 19 Exhibit 14,
Att: 20 Exhibit 15,
Att: 21 Exhibit 16,
Att: 22 Exhibit 17
10 10 motion Summary Judgment Thu 03/07 4:57 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by City of Corvallis. (Shepherd, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
8 8 notice Attorney Association Thu 02/22 8:08 AM
Notice of Association of Attorney of Amanda Reilly, Kenneth S. Montoya appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Amanda
minute Status Conference Thu 02/22 10:17 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Ann L. Aiken. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Formal written Order to follow. The Court sets the following schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by 3/7/2024. Plaintiff's response and cross motion for summary judgment is due by 3/28/2024. Defendant's reply and response to Plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment is due by 4/18/2024. Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/2/2024. Jesse Buss present as counsel for plaintiff. Kerry Shepherd, Jordan Pahl, Amanda Reilly present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: FTR - Courtroom 1. (ck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
7 7 oth_doc Joint Status Report Tue 02/20 1:16 PM
Joint Status Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Buss, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 02/13 1:55 PM
Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal Related [+] . Filed by City of Corvallis. (Pahl, Jordan)
Related: [-] .1
4 4 3 pgs order Order Tue 02/13 11:18 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 2/13/2024 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Scheduling Tue 02/13 1:29 PM
Scheduling Order: Status Conference is set for 2/22/2024 at 09:30AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
3 3 trial Exhibit Thu 02/01 8:55 AM
Exhibits Exhibit 2 re Notice of Removal,1 . Filed by City of Corvallis. (Shepherd, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 01/31 3:51 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/30/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/1/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 7/1/2024. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 01/31 9:21 AM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 24CV03484 from Benton County. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9257521 issued.. Filed by City of Corvallis. (Shepherd, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet