Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:D Edward Snow
Case #: 6:24-cv-00040
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause07:1926 Water and Waste Facility Loans and Grants
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Wagoner Public Works Authority
Represented By
Natalie Sears
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tul)
contact info
Bryan J. Nowlin
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tul)
contact info
Christopher Gnaedig
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tul)
contact info
Defendant
Wagoner, City of
Represented By
Natalie Sears
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tul)
contact info
Bryan J. Nowlin
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tul)
contact info
Christopher Gnaedig
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tul)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma
Represented By
Steven M. Harris
Doyle Harris Davis & Haughey
contact info
Steven Max Harris
Doyle Harris Davis & Haughey
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
47 47 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Mon 05/12 9:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting Status Conference for 5/16/2025 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
46 46 order 09 - MO Consent to Magistrate Judge Disposition of Case Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Thu 05/08 1:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: The parties have expressly indicated by the submission of consent forms signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. As a result, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. The consent forms will be maintained in the Clerk's office. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-40-DES. Additionally, the Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2025 and Jury Trial set for 9/2/2025 before District Judge Ronald A. White are STRICKEN, to be reset before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
45 45 minutes 32 - Settlement Conference Held Wed 05/07 3:26 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings - Settlement Conference held on 5/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Plaintiff Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma was present by representatives Brad Jeffers, Mel Baker, Jamie Fulk, Becky Campbell, and Jordan Allison with counsel Steven Harris. Defendants City of Wagoner and Wagoner Public Works Authority were present by representatives Dalton Self, Jessica Zwirtz, and Kenneth Hicks with counsel Bryan Nowlin. Conference concluded WITHOUT settlement; however, conference is CONTINUED by agreement of the parties. Parties will contact chambers to schedule the second settlement conference, of which will be held via Zoom. (hkf, Chambers)
Related: [-]
44 44 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Wed 05/07 10:46 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow resetting scheduling order date(s): Discovery due by 6/30/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2025. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 8/8/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White. Jury Trial set for 9/2/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
43 43 order Ruling on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Dates Tue 05/06 3:34 PM
ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting in part and denying in part39 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Dates. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
42 42 misc Expert Witness Report Fri 05/02 3:26 PM
Supplemental EXPERT WITNESS REPORT of Ronald J. Creason, CPA by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (With attachments)(Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
41 41 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 04/23 2:22 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Logan L. James on behalf of Wagoner Public Works Authority, Wagoner, City of (James, Logan)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Expert Witness Report Wed 04/23 1:24 PM
Supplemental EXPERT WITNESS REPORT Engineering Report by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (With attachments)(Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
39 39 motion Extend Scheduling Order Dates Fri 04/18 3:01 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Dates Amend Scheduling Order and Reset Trial by Wagoner Public Works Authority, Wagoner, City of Responses due by 5/2/2025(Nowlin, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
38 38 order Ruling on Motion to Clarify Wed 04/09 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting34 Joint Motion for Court to Clarify Pretrial and Jury Trial Setting: The parties are informed that the20 Scheduling Order entered on 4/25/2024 stands, including the Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2025 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White and the Jury Trial set for 8/5/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White. The parties are further informed that the Court is contemplating trailing this case to the Court's criminal docket. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
37 37 trial Witness List Mon 03/31 4:38 PM
Preliminary WITNESS LIST by Wagoner Public Works Authority, Wagoner, City of (Nowlin, Bryan)
Related: [-]
36 36 trial Witness List Mon 03/31 4:32 PM
Final WITNESS LIST by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
35 35 trial Exhibit List Mon 03/31 3:00 PM
Final EXHIBIT LIST by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
34 34 motion Clarify Fri 03/28 11:39 AM
Joint MOTION to Clarify from Court the Pretrial and Jury Trial Setting Related [+] by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma Responses due by 4/11/2025(Harris, Steven)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order,,
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
33 33 misc Expert Witness Report Wed 02/26 11:58 AM
EXPERT WITNESS REPORT of Ronald J. Creason, CPA by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (With attachments)(Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
32 32 misc Expert Witness Report Thu 02/20 11:00 AM
EXPERT WITNESS REPORT Rebuttal Expert Report of Louis Funk by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (With attachments)(Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
31 31 order Ruling on Motion to Continue Hearing(s) Mon 02/17 12:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson granting (Doc.30 ) Defendants' Motion to Continue Hearing(s). The settlement conference is hereby RESET for 5/7/2025 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, U.S. Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Robertson. The requirements set forth in (Doc.23 ) Settlement Conference Order remain in full force and effect. Settlement conference statements must be submitted by 4/30/2025. (hkf, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
30 30 motion Continue Hearing(s) Mon 02/10 4:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing(s) Settlement Conference by All Defendants Responses due by 2/24/2025(Nowlin, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/30 2:24 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Expert Reports by Wagoner, City of, Wagoner Public Works Authority (With attachments)(Nowlin, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
28 28 order Ruling on Motion to Continue Hearing(s) Mon 12/30 11:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson granting27 Unopposed Motion to Continue the Settlement Conference. The settlement conference scheduled for 1/13/2025 is hereby RESET for 2/27/2025 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, U.S. Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Robertson. The requirements set forth in23 Settlement Conference Order remain in full force and effect. Settlement conference statements must be submitted by 2/13/2025. (hkf, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
27 27 motion Continue Hearing(s) Mon 12/23 4:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing(s) Settlement Conference by Wagoner, City of, Wagoner Public Works Authority Responses due by 1/6/2025(Nowlin, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
26 26 misc Expert Witness Report Wed 11/27 3:16 PM
EXPERT WITNESS REPORT by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (With attachments)(Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/11 9:17 AM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Expert Engineering Report by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (With attachments)(Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
24 24 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Thu 05/02 2:37 PM
Amended DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
23 23 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Mon 04/29 1:18 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting Settlement Conference for 1/13/2025 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Settlement Conference Statements must be submitted by 1/3/2025. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
22 22 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Fri 04/26 12:08 PM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Wagoner Public Works Authority, Wagoner, City of (Nowlin, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
21 21 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Thu 04/25 3:45 PM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
20 20 order 05 - Scheduling Order Thu 04/25 2:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting scheduling order date(s): Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 6/3/2024. Exhibit List due by 3/31/2025. Witness List due by 3/31/2025. Discovery due by 5/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2025. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 7/10/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2025 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White.(tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes 31 - Scheduling Conference Held Thu 04/25 2:47 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow: Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2024. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
18 18 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Tue 04/23 3:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow RESETTING Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. (COURTROOM AND TIME CHANGE)(tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
17 17 notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 04/22 4:40 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Gnaedig on behalf of Wagoner Public Works Authority, Wagoner, City of (Gnaedig, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
16 16 misc Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 Mon 04/15 12:09 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
15 15 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Mon 04/01 1:44 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2024 at 3:30 PM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 4/19/2024. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 02/20 2:58 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Natalie Sears on behalf of Wagoner Public Works Authority, Wagoner, City of (Sears, Natalie)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 12:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Related [+] by Wagoner Public Works Authority, Wagoner, City of (Nowlin, Bryan)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
12 12 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 02/20 12:48 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryan J. Nowlin on behalf of Wagoner Public Works Authority, Wagoner, City of (Nowlin, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
11 11 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 02/06 4:09 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Max Harris on behalf of Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
10 10 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Referred to MJ Tue 02/06 10:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: The parties are advised that this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow for all pretrial and discovery matters, including dispositive motions, in accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-24-040-RAW-DES. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
9 9 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Mon 02/05 3:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-40-RAW. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Mon 02/05 1:54 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (Harris, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 02/01 4:09 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to City of Wagoner, Oklahoma. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/01 4:05 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Wagoner Public Works Authority. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Paid in Full - CV Thu 02/01 2:54 PM
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/1/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-1901049 Related [+] by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma (Harris, Steven)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
5 5 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Parties to File Disclosure Statements Wed 01/31 1:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Submission of Notice of Consent or DJO in Magistrate Assigned Cases Wed 01/31 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at[LINK:https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil] in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/21/2024)(jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - New CV Case Fee Payment Wed 01/31 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $405 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 2/7/2024) Related [+] (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Wagoner, Oklahoma, Wagoner Public Works Authority by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/31 1:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Rural Water District No. 6 Wagoner County, Oklahoma. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]