Maryland District Court
Judge:Peter J Messitte
Case #: 8:24-cv-00315
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
BWW Law Group LLC
6003 Executive Bouelard Suite 101
Rockville, MD 20852
Represented By
Peter J Duhig
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Defendant
NationStar Mortgage LLC
Represented By
Peter J Duhig
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By
Peter J Duhig
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By
Peter J Duhig
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr
Represented By
Jeffrey W Styles
The Washington Legal Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Russell E. Morgan, JR
12619 Cambleton Dr
Upper Marlboro, MD 20774
Represented By
Jeffrey W Styles
The Washington Legal Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/10 4:52 PM
ORDER setting telephonic status conference for Wednesday, April 16, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. Eastern Time. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 4/10/2025. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/18 2:59 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Russell E. Morgan, JR, Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/18/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/17 2:27 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr, Russell E. Morgan, JR (Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
19 19 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/24 4:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BWW Law Group LLC, NationStar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, U.S. Bank Trust National Association(Duhig, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/25 6:28 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'17 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/25/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/25 10:45 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by NationStar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, U.S. Bank Trust National Association(Duhig, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/25 6:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: NationStar Mortgage LLC answer due 5/24/2024; Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC answer due 5/24/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 03/27 11:32 AM
ORDER granting14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to1 Complaint . Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 3/26/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order Wed 03/27 11:30 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving13 Notice of Intent to File a Motion filed by BWW Law Group LLC. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/26/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/27 11:33 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: NationStar Mortgage LLC answer due 4/26/2024; Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC answer due 4/26/2024; U.S. Bank Trust National Association answer due 4/26/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/22 2:14 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by NationStar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, U.S. Bank Trust National Association(Duhig, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/19 3:11 PM
NOTICE by BWW Law Group LLC of Intent to File a Motion to Dismiss (Cohen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/18 12:24 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/15 1:36 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 3/15/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order 25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing Mon 03/18 12:20 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 3/15/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/04 8:30 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs'6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 3/1/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Fri 03/01 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Defendants NationStar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, and U.S. Bank Trust National Association or counsel for NationStar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, and U.S. Bank Trust National Association are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/15/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/29 4:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by NationStar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, U.S. Bank Trust National Association(Duhig, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Sunday, February 25, 2024
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Sun 02/25 5:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr, Russell E. Morgan, JR(Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
5 5 order 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause Fri 02/16 3:30 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiffs Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr, Russell E. Morgan, JR to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 3/29/2024 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Plaintiffs Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr, Russell E. Morgan, JR files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 2/16/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Thu 02/01 2:16 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 2/1/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/01 1:49 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to BWW Law Group LLC, NationStar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, U.S. Bank Trust National Association.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Thu 02/01 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Plaintiffs Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr, Russell E. Morgan, JR or counsel for Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr, Russell E. Morgan, JR are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/15/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Russell E. Morgan, JR, Estate of Russell E. Morgan Sr.(Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BWW Law Group,
Att: 3 Summons Nationstar Mortgage,
Att: 4 Summons U.S. Bank Trust,
Att: 5 Supplement Rushmore Loan Management Services