Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:24-cv-00061
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 04, 2024
misc Acknowledgment of District Case Transfer Tue 03/05 9:17 AM
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in WDTX District, Del Rio Division as case number DR-24-CV-27. (ad3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/29 11:50 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING: It is therefore ORDERED that the above-referenced case is TRANSFERRED to the Del Rio Division of the Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/28 9:59 AM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sammy Alvin Cordell. (ad3)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/28 9:51 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maverick County Jail amending1 Complaint filed by Sammy Alvin Cordell.(ad3)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/02 11:18 AM
ORDER re1 Complaint filed by Sammy Alvin Cordell. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis and that Plaintiff, on or before March 4, 2024, must submit either the filing fee of $405.00 or a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. It is finally ORDERED that Plaintiff shall complete the forms for filing a civil rights complaint and shall return them to the Court on or before March 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.(zv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Blank 1983 Form,
Att: 2 Blank IFP Form
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 misc Case Opening Letter Wed 01/31 3:09 PM
Case Opening Letter for Maverick County Jail. (ad3)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Sammy Alvin Cordell.(ad3)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet