Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:24-cv-00240
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Online Land Market LLC
Plaintiff
Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly
Represented By
Richard A Wojcio
Friedman, Suder & Cooke
contact info
Joel Benjamin Rothman
Sriplaw
contact info
Marian V Quintero
Sriplaw PA
contact info
Craig Anthony Wirth
Frank Weinberg & Black Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
24 24 misc Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office Tue 02/11 2:22 PM
Report to Copyright Office of Final Order. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (agc)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Judgment Tue 02/11 12:03 PM
JUDGMENT - It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Online Land Market [Dkt. No. 19] is GRANTED. (The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. ) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/11/2025) (chmb) (Main Document 23 replaced on 2/11/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Findings and Recommendations on Case Tue 02/11 12:01 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/11/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
21 21 motion Findings and Recommendations Mon 01/27 9:13 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should grant Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly's19 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Online Land Market. Defendant Online Land Market should be permanently enjoined from further infringing any of Reillys copyrighted work. And Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly should be awarded statutory damages of $87,372, attorneys fees and costs in the amount of $3,680.50, and pre-judgment interest at a rate of five percent (5%) per annum, to be calculated as simple interest, accruing from 1/31/2024 the date Reilly filed her Complaint until the day before entry of final judgment. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/24/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
20 20 order Order Referring Motion Mon 07/22 10:38 AM
ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion. The Court refers Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Online Land Market, LLC, Doc. No. 19, to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for hearing if necessary and determination. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/22/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
19 19 motion Default Judgment Fri 07/19 3:49 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Online Land Market LLC filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Quintero, Marian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Final Default - Reilly Decl,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 to Final Default - Marian Quintero Decl.,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 to Final Default - Valuation of rights-managed license (Reilly),
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4 to Quintero Declaration Invoice,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Final Default
Monday, July 01, 2024
18 18 order Order Mon 07/01 10:58 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff filed this suit on January 31, 2024. Doc. No. 1. The record reflects that Plaintiff served Defendant on February 2, 2024. Doc. No. 11. The Clerk has entered default against Defendant, but Plaintiff has not moved for default judgment. Doc. No. 17. The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to file a motion for default judgment no later than July 19, 2024. Failure to timely comply with this order WILL RESULT in dismissal of this suit without prejudice. N.D. Tex. L.R. 55.1. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/1/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
17 17 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 05/02 3:15 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Online Land Market LLC. (kcr)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/02 11:22 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff (the "Motion"). Doc. No. 15. Upon consideration of the same, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Attorney Craig A. Wirth is withdrawn. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/2/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
15 15 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/01 2:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/23 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marian V Quintero on behalf of Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Quintero, Marian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/10 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/01 11:28 AM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s) Declaration of Craig A. Wirth in support,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A- Affidavit of Service
Thursday, February 08, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Thu 02/08 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Online Land Market LLC ; served on 2/2/2024. (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/08 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard A Wojcio on behalf of Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wojcio, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
9 9 6 pgs order Order Fri 02/02 10:47 AM
ORDER: This Order governs requests to file materials in this case under seal. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/2/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/02 10:28 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is Plaintiff Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (the "Motion"). Doc. No. 7. Upon consideration of the same, the Court DENIES the Motion. Ms. Reilly shall designate local counsel in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.10 no later than February 23, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/2/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/01 8:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/01 7:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Online Land Market LLC. (kcr)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office Thu 02/01 7:49 AM
Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (kcr)
Related: [-]
4 4 qcref Kinkeade Wed 01/31 4:52 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 01/31 2:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Wed 01/31 2:17 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Online Land Market, LLC filed by Jennifer Rondinelli Reilly. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14356164) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wirth, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2-Infringement,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet