California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-00848
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Mar 25, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Calibre International, LLC
Plaintiff
ERTC Express, LLC
Represented By
Ryan L. Isenberg
Isenberg And Hewitt, P.C.
contact info
David N Lake
Law Offices Of David Lake Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Monday, March 25, 2024
18 18 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 03/25 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Lake, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 03/25 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-00848 RGK(BFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
16 16 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 03/21 12:31 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Proof of Service14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proof of Service is lacking the assigned Judges' initials. Correct case number is 2:24-cv-00848-AS, see Notice to Counsel issued on 02/01/24 (ECF No. 5). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Thu 03/21 12:28 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr) Modified on 3/21/2024 (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 02/16 2:50 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant ERTC Express, LLC, upon Defendant Calibre International, LLC served on 2/7/2024, answer due 2/28/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mariela Martinez, HR Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Lake, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
13 13 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/07 4:43 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting10 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan L. Isenberg's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ERTC EXPRESS, LLC, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/07 1:00 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: denying8 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan L. Isenberg's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ERTC EXPRESS, LLC. (hr) Modified on 2/7/2024 (hr)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 02/07 12:56 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan L. Isenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/31/2024, Receipt No. 36831027)8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filing is missing the assigned Judges' initials. Correct case number is CV24-00848-AS, see Notice to Counsel issued on 2/1/24 (ECF No. 5). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 02/07 11:29 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan L. Isenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/31/2024, Receipt No. 36831027) filed by Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC. (Lake, David) Modified on 2/7/2024 (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Wed 02/07 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan L. Isenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/31/2024, Receipt No. 36831027)8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (ak)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 02/06 3:33 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan L. Isenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/31/2024, Receipt No. 36831027) filed by Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC. (Lake, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Warrant Proposed Order
Friday, February 02, 2024
7 7 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 02/02 2:45 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/01 3:24 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Calibre International, LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Thu 02/01 3:23 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 01/31 2:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC, (Lake, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 01/31 1:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC. (Lake, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 01/31 1:58 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC. (Lake, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/31 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36830313 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff ERTC Express, LLC. (Attorney David N Lake added to party ERTC Express, LLC(pty:pla))(Lake, David)
Related: [-]