Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 2:24-cv-00008
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, May 23, 2024
19 19 misc Judgment - Clerk Thu 05/23 8:06 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Berry (TAG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
18 18 misc Mail Returned Wed 04/17 10:18 AM
Mail re17 sent to Berry Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
17 17 16 pgs order Order Setting - MT ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 04/05 8:04 AM
ORDER denying15 MOTION for Waiver,9 MOTION for Subpoena,14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Amended complaint due within 30 days if Order; if not filed, Clerk of Court is directed to close this matter and enter judgment. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/5/2024. Mailed to Berry with form (TAG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT Wed 02/28 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
15 15 motion Order/Judgment - MT Wed 02/28 9:18 AM
MOTION for Waiver by Plaintiff Brett Berry. (TAG)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 02/28 9:18 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Brett Berry. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/26 2:27 PM
Writ by Brett Berry (TAG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/16 10:16 AM
NOTICE by Brett Berry (TAG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT Fri 02/09 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
10 10 misc Supplement - MT Fri 02/09 9:51 AM
SUPPLEMENT re2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner by Brett Berry. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
9 9 motion Order/Judgment - MT Wed 02/07 11:21 AM
MOTION for Subpoena by Plaintiff Brett Berry. (TAG)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT Wed 02/07 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Letter
Monday, February 05, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/05 4:14 PM
NOTICE by Brett Berry (TAG)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Mon 02/05 4:14 PM
Letter from Berry (TAG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Wed 01/31 3:46 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Berry. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/31/2024. Mailed to Berry and BSBDC (TAG)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/31 3:45 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/31/2024. Mailed to Berry (TAG)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Opening - MT Wed 01/31 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Berry with docket sheet (TAG)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT Wed 01/31 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 405 not paid), filed by Brett Berry. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/31 3:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brett Berry. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Account Statement