New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-00688
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Terminated:Feb 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Emil Kirkegaard
Plaintiff
Oliver D. Smith


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 16, 2024
4 4 order Judgment Fri 02/16 6:59 PM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the February 14, 2024, order, this action is dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/14/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeals Package
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 02/16 6:57 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's request to withdraw this action (ECF No. 2) is granted. The Court dismisses this action without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). All other pending matters in this case are terminated. This order closes this action. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/14/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Tue 02/13 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/13 3:16 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 2 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Laura Taylor Swain for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Pro Se case. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/01 10:12 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Emil Kirkegaard. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT against Emil Kirkegaard. Document filed by Oliver D. Smith..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 01/31 10:08 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]