Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Eduardo I Sanchez
Case #: 1:24-cv-20397
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Steven Davidovici
Represented By
Roberto Zarco
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Jacky Beda
contact info
Merema Mary Nikezic
contact info
Defendant
ILOV305 I LLC
Represented By
Roberto Zarco
Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, P.A.
contact info
Jacky Beda
contact info
Merema Mary Nikezic
contact info
Plaintiff
Felix A. Atucha
Represented By
Zandro E. Palma
Zandro E. Palma, P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Erez Davidovici
Terminated: 05/01/2024


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 05/21 8:21 AM
ORDER. Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 05/17 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Felix A. Atucha (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/16 2:09 PM
AMENDED ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Eduardo Sanchez for a settlement conference. By May 27, 2024, the Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiff's Statement of Claim [ECF No. 7]. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 05/03 10:14 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 15 the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall respond to1 the Complaint by May 22, 2024 . Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/3/2024. (rco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 05/02 12:01 PM
ORDER. Dismissing Case as to Party(ies) Erez Davidovici (individually) - case remains open. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 05/01 6:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Steven Davidovici, ILOV305 I LLC.(Nikezic, Merema Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/01 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roberto Zarco on behalf of Steven Davidovici, ILOV305 I LLC. Attorney Roberto Zarco added to party Steven Davidovici(pty:dft), Attorney Roberto Zarco added to party ILOV305 I LLC(pty:dft). (Zarco, Roberto)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/01 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacky Beda on behalf of Steven Davidovici, ILOV305 I LLC. Attorney Jacky Beda added to party Steven Davidovici(pty:dft), Attorney Jacky Beda added to party ILOV305 I LLC(pty:dft). (Beda, Jacky)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/01 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Merema Mary Nikezic on behalf of Steven Davidovici, ILOV305 I LLC. Attorney Merema Mary Nikezic added to party Steven Davidovici(pty:dft), Attorney Merema Mary Nikezic added to party ILOV305 I LLC(pty:dft). (Nikezic, Merema Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/10 5:09 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Felix A. Atucha. Steven Davidovici served on 4/10/2024, response/answer due 5/1/2024. (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/10 5:04 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Felix A. Atucha. ILOV305 I LLC served on 4/10/2024, response/answer due 5/1/2024. (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 03/29 1:51 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, we hereby ORDER the Plaintiff to serve all of the Defendants and to file proof of service on the docket by April 30, 2024. Failure to serve by that date will result in dismissal of any unserved Defendants without further notice. Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2024. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/04 1:40 PM
ORDER REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Eduardo Sanchez for rulings on all pre-trial non-dispositive and discovery matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
7 7 misc Statement Fri 02/09 6:15 PM
Statement of: Claim by Felix A. Atucha re4 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 02/05 12:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES TO SET SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. To set the Settlement Conference mandated by the District Court, ECF No.4 , counsel for Plaintiff shall send an e-mail to chambers_becerra@flsd.uscourts.gov, within seven days of all counsel filing their Notice of Appearances, or within seven days of this order if all counsel have already filed appearances. The e-mail shall list at least three different dates and times where all counsel and parties are available for the Settlement Conference. These dates must all be within the deadline set forth in the District Court's Order in Actions Brought Under the Fair Labor Standards Act, ECF No.4 . The Court prefers to set settlement conferences on Tuesdays and Thursdays at 9:00 a.m., 12:00 p.m., or 3:00 p.m. If counsel and the parties are not available on those dates and times, they are permitted to propose other dates and times, but all proposed dates must be within the deadline set above. Plaintiff's counsel shall copy all counsel on the e-mail to chambers. Failure to submit proposed dates by the deadline will result in the Court setting the conference unilaterally. The Settlement Conference will not be continued absent compelling circumstances (i.e., counsel has a conflict with another court hearing). The Settlement Conference will be conducted in-person. In providing dates for the Settlement Conference, counsel should note that: (1) The Settlement Conference must be attended, except as provided under Local Rule 16.2(e) for public-sector entities, by counsel of record and each party. (2) In the event that a monetary settlement would be payable from proceeds of an insurance policy, a claims professional/representative(s) from the party's insurer, with full and final authority to authorize payment to settle the matter up to the full limits of the party's policy shall be present. The failure of a party representative with full and final authority to make and accept offers of settlement to attend this Conference may result in the undersigned's sua sponte recommendation to the District Judge that sanctions be entered against the offending party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 2/5/2024. (nsy)
Related: [-]
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 02/05 11:25 AM
ORDER in Cases with Multiple Defendants. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order of Requirements Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 02/05 11:24 AM
Order in Actions brought under the Fair Labors Standards Act. (Statement of Claim due by 2/12/2024.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 02/01 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Erez Davidovici, Steven Davidovici, ILOV305 I LLC. (nan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 02/01 11:35 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 7:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Erez Davidovici, Steven Davidovici, ILOV305 I LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17257578, filed by Felix A. Atucha.(Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Summon(s)