Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:24-cv-00433
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Aug 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 6:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Glock Professional, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Paul Kohler
Miller & Martin, Pllc - Atl
contact info
Patrick David Testa
Miller & Martin PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Norton
Represented By
James E. Radford
Radford Scott, LLP
contact info
Zachary Panter
Radford Scott LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 08/27 11:45 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING20 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 08/27 11:46 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand terminated from case. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
20 20 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/26 2:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Patricia Norton. (Radford, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
19 19 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/26 11:02 AM
NOTICE by Glock Professional, Inc. of Intent to Serve Subpoenas(Testa, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 13 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 13 pgs Exhibit 3
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Thu 06/20 3:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Discovery Requests by Patricia Norton.(Panter, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Mon 06/10 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Discovery Responses) by Glock Professional, Inc..(Kohler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
16 16 17 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 05/30 10:20 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/30/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
15 15 2 pgs motion Protective Order Tue 05/28 2:50 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Glock Professional, Inc..(Testa, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Tue 05/21 11:40 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Glock Professional, Inc..(Testa, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Thu 05/09 11:35 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests to Defendant by Patricia Norton.(Panter, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 05/08 11:42 AM
Clerk's Notation re10 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
12 12 discov Certificate of Service Mon 05/06 5:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (of Defendant's Initial Disclosures) by Glock Professional, Inc..(Testa, Patrick)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Mon 05/06 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Patricia Norton.(Panter, Zachary)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/06 3:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Patricia Norton. (Panter, Zachary)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/06 2:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. For good cause shown, the parties request for an extension of discovery is GRANTED. The discovery period, including discovery from third parties, is extended for two months and ends on November 4, 2024. The Court extends the deadline for filing a proposed consolidated pretrial order until forty (40) days after the close of the discovery period, or, in the event that any party files a motion for summary judgment, until thirty (30) days after the district courts final ruling on all pending motions for summary judgment, whichever is later. Plaintiff has failed to file a CIP. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a CIP within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/6/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
8 8 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 05/03 2:25 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Glock Professional, Inc.. (Kohler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 04/08 4:15 PM
Clerk's Notation re7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by March H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/05 1:19 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glock Professional, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Glock, Inc. for Glock Professional, Inc.. (Kohler, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/05 1:16 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Glock Professional, Inc.. Discovery ends on 9/3/2024.(Kohler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/01 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Kohler on behalf of Glock Professional, Inc. (Kohler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
4 4 misc Leave of Absence Fri 02/23 5:07 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 1-8, June 11-17, June 24-July 5, July 7-12, 2024, by Michael Paul Kohler. (Kohler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/05 11:15 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Glock Professional, Inc.. Glock Professional, Inc. waiver mailed on 2/5/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Kohler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 01/31 9:34 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Glock Professional, Inc. (nmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/31 9:32 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Patricia Norton. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13191165)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/31/2024 to correct file date (nmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet