Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: Christopher C Bly
Case #: 1:24-cv-00450
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Sodexo-Magic
Plaintiff
Anthony Andrews
3871 Redwine Road Apt. 3208
Atlanta, GA 30344
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ben Moodie
Terminated: 05/20/2024
Defendant
Joe Palanco
Terminated: 05/20/2024
Defendant
Joyce Simpson
Terminated: 03/18/2024
Defendant
Ahmad Jahlo
Terminated: 05/20/2024
Defendant
SODEXOMAGIC
Terminated: 03/18/2024


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, October 28, 2024
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/28 9:48 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sodexo-Magic. (Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
28 28 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/22 2:03 PM
RESPONSE re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anthony Andrews. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 10/21 12:19 PM
Submission of26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 10/02 3:04 PM
Clerk's Notation re27 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
27 27 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/01 6:01 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sodexo-Magic identifying Corporate Parent Sodexo, Inc. for Sodexo-Magic. (Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 10/01 5:53 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Sodexo-Magic.(Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
25 25 service Summons Issued Tue 07/23 4:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Sodexo-Magic. (gww)
Related: [-]
24 24 service USM 285 Service Tue 07/23 4:31 PM
Package prepared and forwarded to USM for service upon Sodexo-Magic (complaint, amended complaint, service order, initial disclosures). (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/23 10:37 AM
Submission of19 Order Directing Service by Clerk to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
23 23 misc Mail Returned Fri 07/19 11:15 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable Related [+] Mail sent to Sodexo-Magic re22 Request for Waiver of Service. (gww)
Related: [-] turn to Sender-Attempted Not Known-Unable to Forward-Return to Sender
Monday, June 17, 2024
22 22 service Request for Waiver of Service Mon 06/17 3:52 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service (2 Notices of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, 2 Waiver of Service of Summons forms, 1 copy of the Complaint, 1 Copy of the Service Order, 1 Copy of the Initial Disclosures form and 1 self-addressed stamped envelope) mailed to Sodexo-Magic on 6/17/2024. If waiver not returned by 7/22/2024, prepare personal service package. (ajw)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 06/17 3:48 PM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Anthony Andrews.(ajw)
Related: [-]
20 20 utility Remark Mon 06/17 3:47 PM
Received USM 285 form and proposed summons as to defendant Sodexo-Magic. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 06/17 4:15 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sodexo-Magic re21 Initial Disclosures,22 Request for Waiver of Service. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
19 19 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Directing Service by Clerk Thu 06/13 10:35 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form, and to return to the Clerk of Court one of each for each Defendant named in the complaint within 21 days from the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Upon receipt of forms, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for each Defendant. In the event a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within Thirty-five(35) days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package for each Defendant who failed to return the waiver form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 6/13/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent Thu 06/13 10:42 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Andrews re19 Order; Forms sent to party: USM 285 (2 copies); Summons (2 copies); Initial Disclosures; (ajw) Plaintiff received order and copies in person at intake counter Modified on 6/13/2024 (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Wed 06/12 3:30 PM
ORDER: The Court APPROVES AND ADOPTS the Non-Final Report and Recommendation Doc.16 as the order of the Court. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant under Title VII are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claims under the ADEA may proceed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to return this case to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/12/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/12 3:31 PM
Submission of18 Order on Report and Recommendation, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/12 3:33 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Andrews re18 Order on Report and Recommendation. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 06/11 9:24 AM
Submission of16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and17 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/24 9:16 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Andrews re16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,17 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 05/24 9:15 AM
ORDER for Service of16 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 5/23/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 05/24 9:13 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re15 Amended Complaint, filed by Anthony Andrews. The Court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's claims under Title VII be DISMISSED but that Plaintiff's claims under the ADEA be allowed to proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 5/23/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/21 12:30 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sodexo-Magic filed by Anthony Andrews.(nmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Relief Thu 05/02 2:34 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a second amended complaint by Thursday 5/23/2024. Plaintiff's13 motion for relief is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the Courts pro se employment discrimination complaint form stamped with the case number for this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 5/2/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Forms Sent Thu 05/02 2:39 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Andrews re14 Order on Motion for Relief. Forms sent to party: pro se employment discrimination complaint form. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/25 4:29 PM
Submission of13 MOTION for Relief to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
13 13 motion For Relief Wed 04/10 9:19 AM
MOTION for Relief by Anthony Andrews. (nmb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/09 4:23 PM
Submission of10 ,11 and12 to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/19 9:02 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ahmad Jahlo, Ben Moodie, Joe Palanco, Sodexo-Magic filed by Anthony Andrews.(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/19/2024 (nmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/18 10:05 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ahmad Jahlo, Ben Moodie, Joe Palanco, SODEXOMAGIC, Joyce Simpson filed by Anthony Andrews.(nmb)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/18 9:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ahmad Jahlo, Ben Moodie, Joe Palanco, SODEXOMAGIC, Joyce Simpson filed by Anthony Andrews.(nmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/26 8:57 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Title VII Claim by Anthony Andrews (nmb)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/26 8:56 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Retaliation by Anthony Andrews (nmb)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/26 8:55 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Additional Documents by Anthony Andrews (nmb)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/26 8:54 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Additional Evidence by Anthony Andrews (nmb)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Mon 02/26 8:53 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Andrews.(nmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
4 4 10 pgs order Order ruling on IFP Mon 02/26 8:49 AM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. The Court ORDERS that if Plaintiff wishes to proceed on any of his discrimination or retaliation claims under the ADEA or Title VII, he must file an amended complaint setting forth the facts supporting his claims for relief, as discussed above, within 21 DAYS of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/26/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/26 9:33 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Andrews re4 Order ruling on IFP. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
utility Docket Correction Thu 02/22 2:54 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re2 and3 Notices of Filing. IFP has not been granted so documents should not have been filed separately. Documents attached to IFP application entry1 . (bgt) Modified on 2/22/2024 (bgt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Fri 02/16 3:47 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Retaliation by Anthony Andrews (nmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Fri 02/16 3:46 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Additional Documents by Anthony Andrews (nmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/31 3:01 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Andrews.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/31 3:02 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jkb)
Related: [-]