Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Charles R Simpson, III
Referred: Regina S Edwards
Case #: 3:24-cv-00064
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441cra Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Abound Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Ambrose K. O'Bryan
Skeeters, Bennett, Wilson & Humphrey
contact info
Defendant
Kafene, Inc.
Represented By
Sean G. Williamson
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, Llp - Louisville
contact info
Matthew L. Bunnell
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, Llp - Louisville
contact info
Defendant
Possible Financial Inc.
Represented By
Reid S. Manley
Burr & Forman Llp - Birmingham
contact info
Defendant
Synovus Bank
Represented By
William E. Smith, III
Kightlinger & Gray Llp - New Albany
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Represented By
Michael E. Gregory
Greglaw, LLC
contact info
Kyleigh Beeker
Quilling, Sealander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser PC
contact info
Gregory E. Mayes
Greg Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
USAA Federal Savings Bank
Represented By
Keith S. Anderson
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Russell B. Morgan
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
World Finance Corporation of Kentucky
Represented By
Nathan H. Blaske
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
John Michael Williams
Williams Kilpatrick, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyra S. Wilson
Represented By
Zachary L. Taylor
Winton & Hiestand Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
71 71 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/07 5:09 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/7/25: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs and fees. cc:counsel (DJT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
70 70 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/05 12:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Anderson, Keith)
Related: [-]