Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-mc-00002
Causeno cause specified
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Re-opened:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
97 97 misc Transcript Fri 04/25 11:46 AM
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on April 18, 2025, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 240-426-7767. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/26/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2025.(stonestreet, rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
96 96 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/18 11:58 AM
ORDER granting91 Motion in Opposition to Valjakka's Privilege Objection. ORDERED that the parties' designated third-party neutral forensic expert, PricewaterhouseCoopers, produce all documents currently sequestered based on Mr. Valjakka's improper claim of privilege (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/18/2025. (kgall)
Related: [-]
95 95 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 04/18 11:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2025 in re91 MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO VALJAKKAS PRIVILEGE OBJECTION. Appearances of counsel. Argument heard. Comments of the Court: Motion91 - GRANTED. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R.Stonestreet)(kgall)
Related: [-]