Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:24-bk-40227
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Feb 29, 2024

Debtor
Nave Communications Company
1430 Bradley Ln Ste 196
Carrollton, TX 75007-4952
Represented By
Kyle Woodard
Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Linda S Payne
Linda S. Payne, Trustee 11700 Preston Road Suite 660-667
Dallas, TX 75230
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 02/01/2024 12:15 AM CST
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
crditcrd none Wed 01/31 6:55 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-40227 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13197787, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 01/31 6:34 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Without Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by Nave Communications Company, Document Due 02/7/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 2/14/2024.(Woodard, Kyle)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Wed 01/31 11:50 PM
341(a)
Related: [-]