Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-20056
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 01, 2024 2:29 AM EST
Defendant
Hamzeh Samarah (1)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Mark A. Gatesman
Mark Gatesman Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Nancy A. Abraham
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/01/2024 3:17 AM EST
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr as to Hamzeh Samarah (1). (KBro) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER WITH MOTION to Seal 2 Arrest Warrant Issued,1 Criminal Complaint as to Hamzeh Samarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (KBro) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Hamzeh Samarah held on 10/19/2023. Detention Hearing set for 10/24/2023 02:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Mark Gatesman) (AUSA: Nancy Abraham) (SKra) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER WITH MOTION to Unseal 2 Arrest Warrant Issued,1 Criminal Complaint as to Hamzeh Samarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (DPer) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
5 5 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Hamzeh Samarah held on 10/19/23 before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. AUDIO FILE SIZE (3.3 MB) (DPer) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Hamzeh Samarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (DPer) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Hamzeh Samarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (DPer) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Hamzeh Samarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (DPer) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of CJA Attorney Appointment: Mark A. Gatesman has accepted the appointment to represent Hamzeh Samarah . (Koelzer, David) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris: Detention Hearing as to Hamzeh Samarah held on 10/24/2023 Disposition: Defendant ordered detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Mark Gatesman) (AUSA: Nancy Abraham) (KCas) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Hamzeh Samarah: Preliminary Examination set for 11/2/2023 01:00 PM (KCas) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
9 9 Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Hamzeh Samarah held on 10/24/23 before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. AUDIO FILE SIZE (17.6 MB) (DPer) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Hamzeh Samarah Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (NAhm) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the Time in Which an Indictment Must be Returned and for a Finding of Excludable Delay as to Hamzeh Samarah, Time excluded from 11/2/2023 until 01/17/2024.( Preliminary Examination set for 1/4/2023 01:30 PM ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
12 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Hamzeh Samarah Time excluded from 1/17/2024 until 2/16/2024.( Preliminary Examination set for 2/1/2024 01:30 PM ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
13 13 REQUEST for appointment of counsel by Hamzeh Samarah. (DPer) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
14 14 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 10/19/2023 as to Hamzeh Samarah. (DAll) [4:23-mj-30418-CI]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Hamzeh Samarah: Arraignment set for 2/1/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy Jr. (SKra)
Related: [-]
15 15 INFORMATION as to Hamzeh Samarah (1) count(s) 1. (KBro)
Related: [-]