California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:24-bk-10730
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Sep 20, 2024

Debtor
Cornerstone Apparel, Inc.
5807 Smithway St
Commerce, CA 90040-1605
Represented By
Young K Chang
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Heide Kurtz (TR)
2515 S. Western Avenue #11
San Pedro, CA 90732
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 02/01/2024 12:28 AM PST
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 01/31 2:38 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-10730] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56436781. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Wed 01/31 3:59 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 2/14/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 2/14/2024. (WK)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Cornerstone Apparel, Inc.
1 1 24 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 01/31 2:36 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Cornerstone Apparel, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/14/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/14/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/14/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/14/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/14/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/14/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 02/14/2024. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 02/14/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 02/14/2024. (Chang, Young)Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 2/14/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 2/14/2024. Modified on 1/31/2024 (WK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Wed 01/31 2:40 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Cornerstone Apparel, Inc.. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Wed 01/31 3:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/28/2024 at 09:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc To comply BK Rule 1007/3015(b) - Ch 7/13 (manual - deforco) (BNC) Wed 01/31 4:03 PM
ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) Related [+] (WK)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Cornerstone Apparel, Inc.