California Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00012
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 01, 2024 11:35 PM PST
Defendant
David Byrd (5)
Defendant
Agustin Gonzalez (3)
Represented By
Kyle Rodger Knapp
Kyle R. Knapp, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Manuel Greenhalgh (8)
Represented By
Etan Zaitsu
Zaitsu Law
contact info
Defendant
Albert Gurley (2)
Represented By
Betty Jean Williams
Law Office Of Williams & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
Craig Hunter (4)
Represented By
Michael Heumann
Law Office Of Michael Heumann
contact info
Daniel Benjamin Olmos
Nolan Barton Olmos & Luciano, LLP
contact info
Christopher Wheless
Nolan Barton & Olmos, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jorge Mejia-Nolasco (6)
Defendant
Delanious Ward (1)
Represented By
Mark Joseph Reichel
Reichel & Plesser, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Yancy (7)
Represented By
Timothy Zindel
Law Office Of Timothy Zindel
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cameron Desmond, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Emily Grace Sauvageau, GOVT
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Jan 12 2024
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/12/2024 as to Manuel Greenhalgh. (Woodson, A)[2:24-mj-00005-DB]
GPO Jan 16 2024
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/16/2024 as to Albert Gurley. (Woodson, A)[2:24-mj-00005-DB]
GPO Jan 18 2024
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY (Unsecured Appearance Bond in the amount of $100,000) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/18/2024 as to Agustin Gonzalez. (Woodson, A)[2:24-mj-00005-DB]
GPO Jan 26 2024
DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/26/2024 as to Craig Hunter. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Feb 07 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 02/06/2024 DENYING 53 Motion to Sever as to Albert Gurley. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies) (Lopez, K)
GPO Mar 08 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cr-0012 TLN, 2:11-cr-0424 TLN and 2:21-cr-0019 TLN. (Benson, A.)RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cr-0012 TLN, 2:11-cr-0424 TLN and 2:21-cr-0019 TLN. (Benson, A.)RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cr-0012 TLN, 2:11-cr-0424 TLN and 2:21-cr-0019 TLN. (Benson, A.)RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cr-0012 TLN, 2:11-cr-0424 TLN and 2:21-cr-0019 TLN. (Benson, A.)RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cr-0012 TLN, 2:11-cr-0424 TLN and 2:21-cr-0019 TLN. (Benson, A.)RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cr-0012 TLN, 2:11-cr-0424 TLN and 2:21-cr-0019 TLN. (Benson, A.)RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cr-0012 TLN, 2:11-cr-0424 TLN and 2:21-cr-0019 TLN. (Benson, A.)RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/07/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cr-0012 TLN, 2:11-cr-0424 TLN and 2:21-cr-0019 TLN. (Benson, A.)
GPO Apr 17 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/16/2024 GRANTING 79 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Daniel Benjamin Olmos as to Craig Hunter. (Woodson, A)
GPO Apr 17 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/16/2024 GRANTING 80 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Christopher Wheless as to Craig Hunter. (Woodson, A)
GPO Jun 05 2024
ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/5/2024 as to David Byrd. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Jul 17 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to David Byrd signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 07/16/24 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 8/22/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Excludable started as to David Byrd: T4 Start: 07/18/24 Stop: 08/22/24. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies) (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Jul 17 2024
ORDER AMENDING SPECIAL CONDITIONS of RELEASE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/17/2024. (Murphy, J)
GPO Aug 21 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to David Byrd signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/20/24, CONTINUING the Status Conference to 9/26/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Excludable started as to David Byrd: XT4 Start: 8/22/24, Stop: 9/26/24. (Salmeron, A)
GPO Sep 24 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to David Byrd signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/24/2024 CONTINUING Status Conference to 10/24/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Excludable started as to David Byrd: T4 Start: 9/26/2024 Stop: 10/24/2024. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies) (Zignago, K.)
GPO Sep 27 2024
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY signed by Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 9/27/2024 as to David Byrd. (Her, S)
GPO Oct 22 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to David Byrd signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/21/2024 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 10/31/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Excludable started as to David Byrd: T4 Start: 10/24/2024 Stop: 10/31/2024. (cc Sac Criminal Agencies). (Lopez, K)
GPO Nov 26 2024
ORDER for funds for travel lodging, and subsistence signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/25/2024 as to Kevin Yancy. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Dec 06 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Agustin Gonzalez signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/24, CONTINUING the Sentencing to 3/13/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Salmeron, A)
GPO Jan 16 2025
JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/2025 as to Albert Gurley. (Deputy Clerk MDK)
GPO Jan 17 2025
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 147 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
GPO Jan 17 2025
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 169 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 169 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 169 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 169 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 169 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 169 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 169 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/16/25 GRANTING 169 Request to Seal. (Deputy Clerk VLC)

Docket last updated: 02/02/2024 12:40 AM PST
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Delanious Ward (1), Albert Gurley (2), Agustin Gonzalez (3), Craig Hunter (4), Kevin Yancy (5), Jorge Mejia-Nolasco (6), Manuel Greenhalgh (7), David Byrd (8). (Licea Chavez, V) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO257 (Sealed) as to Delanious Ward, Albert Gurley, Agustin Gonzalez, Craig Hunter, Kevin Yancy, Jorge Mejia-Nolasco, Manuel Greenhalgh, David Byrd (Licea Chavez, V) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 01/09/24 as to Delanious Ward, Albert Gurley, Agustin Gonzalez, Craig Hunter, Kevin Yancy, Jorge Mejia-Nolasco, Manuel Greenhalgh, David Byrd. (Licea Chavez, V) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
5 5 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/11/2024: CASE UNSEALED as to all defendants per authorization from C. Quirk on behalf of AUSA C. Desmond. (Her, S) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTES (Text Only) for INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Delanious Ward (1) and Manuel Greenhalgh (7) held before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/11/2024. Both defendants present, Mr. Ward out of custody, and Mr. Greenhalgh, in custody. Mark Reichel, CJA counsel, was appointed for defendant Mr. Ward. Etan Zaitsu, CJA counsel, was appointed for defendant Mr. Greenhalgh. Both defendants were advised of their rights and pending charges. The government did not move for detention as to defendant, Mr. Ward, and requested the matter of detention continued to tomorrow to allow time to gather information for a full pretrial services report. No objections from defense counsel, Mr. Reichel. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court ordered Mr. Ward REMAIN RELEASED with standard pretrial conditions of release. As to detention on defendant, Mr. Greenhalgh, the government moved for detention. Defense counsel, Mr. Zaitsu for Mr. Greenhalgh, argued for the release of the defendant. After the hearing, the Court ordered the defendant, Mr. Greenhalgh, TEMPORARILY DETAINED and set a detention hearing for tomorrow to allow time to gather information for a full pretrial services report. Detention Hearing SET as to Delanious Ward (1) and Manuel Greenhalgh (7) for 1/12/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Preliminary Examination SET as to Delanious Ward (1) and Manuel Greenhalgh (7) for 1/25/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. Government Counsel: Cameron Desmond present. Defense Counsel: Mark Reichel -01, Etan Zaitsu -07 present. Custody Status: Out of Custody -01, In Custody -07. Court Reporter: ECRO: R. Alvarez. (Her, S) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
7 7 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/11/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Manuel Greenhalgh is Legs Only when alone and Fully Shackled with co-defendants (USM # None Provided). (Her, S) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
8 8 1 pgs MEMORANDUM by USA as to Kevin Yancy in To Set Initial Appearance. (Desmond, Cameron) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTES (Text Only) for INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Agustin Gonzalez (5) held before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/12/2024. Defendant present, in custody. CJA Counsel, Kyle Knapp, was appointed to represent the defendant. Defendant was advised of his rights and pending charges. The government moved for detention. Defense requested the matter of detention continued. No objections from the government for continued detention hearing. After the hearing, the Court ordered the defendant TEMPORARILY DETAINED and SET a Detention Hearing for 1/17/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Preliminary Examination also SET for 1/25/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The Court has been notified that an interpreter is required in this action for Agustin Gonzalez. It is counsel's responsibility to timely notify the Court Staff Interpreter when a hearing requiring an interpreter is scheduled, continued or cancelled. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. See [LINK:LR 403 - Court Interpreter Services in Criminal Actions] Government Counsel: Cameron Desmond present. Defense Counsel: Kyle Knapp present. Custody Status: In Custody. Court Reporter: ECRO. Interpreter: Carol Meredith, Language: Spanish (Her, S) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
10 10 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/12/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Agustin Gonzalez is Legs Only and Full Shackling with co-defendants (USM # None Provided). (Her, S) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
11 11 MINUTES (Text Only) for DETENTION HEARING as to Delanious Ward (1) and Manuel Greenhalgh (7) held before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/12/2024. Defendant Mr. Ward present, out of custody. Defendant Mr. Greenhalgh present, in custody. Mr. Reichel, previously appointed for Mr. Ward. Mr. Zaitsu, previously appointed for Mr. Greenhalgh. The government did not seek detention as to Mr. Ward. No objections from defense counsel. The Court ORDERED the defendant, Mr. Ward (1) REMAIN RELEASED on a $25,000.00 unsecured bond to be cosigned by defendant's mother, Linda Graves, and daughter, Daija Ward, by 1/19/2024, defendant is released to the third-party custody of Linda Graves, and with pretrial conditions of release. Mr. Ward is to report directly to the Pretrial Services office after today's hearing in Sacramento, at 501 I Street, 2nd Floor, Suite 2-400, Sacramento, CA 95814. As to detention for Mr. Greenhalgh (7), the government did not seek detention and concurs with pretrial release recommendations. No objection from defense counsel. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court ordered Mr. Greenhalgh (7) RELEASED forthwith on a $10,000.00 unsecured bond to be cosigned by defendant's mother, Stacy Greenhalgh, by 1/16/2024 close of business, and with pretrial conditions of release. Furthermore, Mr. Greenhalgh is to report directly to the Pretrial Services office on 1/16/2024 at 9:00 AM in Sacramento, at 501 I Street, 2nd Floor, Suite 2-400, Sacramento, CA 95814. Government Counsel: Cameron Desmond present. Defense Counsel: Mark Reichel -01, Etan Zaitsu -07 present. Custody Status: Out of Custody -01, In Custody -07. Court Reporter: ECRO. (Her, S) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
16 16 SPECIAL CONDITIONS of RELEASE as to Delanious Ward. (Her, S) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
17 17 SPECIAL CONDITIONS of RELEASE as to Manuel Greenhalgh. (Her, S) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/12/2024 as to Manuel Greenhalgh. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
22 22 APPEARANCE BOND (Unsecured Bond) as to Delanious Ward in the amount of $25,000. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
23 23 THIRD PARTY CUSTODY releasing Delanious Ward to Linda Graves. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
12 12 NOTICE of Filing of $10k Unsecured Bond. (Zaitsu, Etan) Modified on 1/16/2024 (Licea Chavez, V). [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
13 13 MINUTES for INITIAL APPEARANCE proceedings, as to Albert Gurley (2), held on 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Betty Williams appointed for Defendant. Defendant advised rights and pending charges. Waived formal reading of the Complaint1 . The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland . The Government moved for detention. Defense counsel proffered argument for release. The court ordered the Defendant DETAINED. Preliminary Examination SET for 1/25/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The court addressed the Prisoner Restraint Level and made the determination of Legs, only. Government Counsel, Cameron Desmond, present. Defense Counsel, Betty Williams, present. Defendant, present, in custody. Court Reporter: ECRO. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
14 14 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER signed on 1/16/2024 by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Kennison, L) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
15 15 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Albert Gurley is Legs, Only (USM # NONE PROVIDED). (Kennison, L) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs MEMORANDUM request to set further detention hearing by USA as to Albert Gurley in Support of. (Desmond, Cameron) Modified on 1/17/2024 (Licea Chavez, V). [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
19 19 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/16/2024: In light of the Government's18 Memorandum, a Detention Hearing, as to Albert Gurley, is SET for 1/18/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE Of Passport Relinquishment. (Zaitsu, Etan) Modified on 1/17/2024 (Licea Chavez, V). [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/16/2024 as to Albert Gurley. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
25 25 COLLATERAL RECEIVED as to Manuel Greenhalgh: U.S. Passport from Manuel Anthony Greenhalgh, No. 517660496. (Kastilahn, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
26 26 MINUTES for DETENTION HEARING proceedings, as to Agustin Gonzalez (3), held on 1/17/2024 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The Government continues to move for detention. Defense counsel requested a continuance of the Detention Hearing to prepare a release plan. A further Detention Hearing SET for 1/18/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Government Counsel, Cameron Desmond, present. Defense counsel, Kyle Knapp, present. Defendant, present, in custody being assisted by the Spanish language interpreter. Spanish Interpreter, Cristina White. Court Reporter: ECRO. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
27 27 5 pgs MEMORANDUM by Albert Gurley. (Williams, Betty) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
28 28 MINUTES for FURTHER DETENTION HEARING proceedings, as to Agustin Gonzalez (3), held on 1/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The Government agreed with the recommendation of release. The court ORDERED the Defendant released on Pretrial conditions and on a $100,000 unsecured bond. A $50,000 unsecured bond is to be signed by Doris Gonzalez and Ashley Gonzalez. A $50,000 unsecured bond is to be signed by Erazmo Perez and Alicia Perez. Mr. Gonzalez is to be released on 1/18/2024, forthwith. The court advised the Defendant of Failure to Appear penalties. Government Counsel, Cameron Desmond, present. Defense Counsel, Kyle Knapp, present. Defendant, present, in custody using the services of the Spanish language interpreter. Spanish Interpreter, Christopher Deruyte. Court Reporter: ECRO. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
29 29 MINUTES for DETENTION HEARING proceedings, as to Albert Gurley (2), held on 1/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Government counsel continued to move for detention. Defense counsel presented argument for release. The court ordered Defendant's continued detention. Government Counsel, Cameron Desmond, present. Defense Counsel, Betty Williams, present. Defendant, present, in custody. Court Reporter: ECRO. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
31 31 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF PERSON IN CUSTODY (Unsecured Appearance Bond in the amount of $100,000) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/18/2024 as to Agustin Gonzalez. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
32 32 NOTICE to DEFENDANT BEING RELEASED as to Agustin Gonzalez. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
33 33 SPECIAL CONDITIONS of RELEASE as to Agustin Gonzalez. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
34 34 Unsecured BOND POSTED as to Agustin Gonzalez in amount of $50,000 by Doris Gonzalez and Ashley Gonzalez. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
35 35 Unsecured BOND POSTED as to Agustin Gonzalez in amount of$50,000 by Erazmo Perez and Alicia Perez. (Woodson, A) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
36 36 TRANSFER DOCUMENTS RECEIVED from Eastern District of Louisiana re Rule 5(c)(3) as to Kevin Yancy. Initial Appearance set for 1/29/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Clemente Licea, O) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
40 40 7 pgs MEMORANDUM by Albert Gurley. (Williams, Betty)[2:24-mj-00005-DB] Modified on 1/26/2024 (Kastilahn, A).
Related: [-]
41 41 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy N. Cannarozzi for Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/24/2024 as to Albert Gurley: The Court is in receipt of40 defendant's Memorandum for Bail Review. The document as filed is defective and must be refiled in compliance with Local Rule 429(a). (Text only entry) (Cannarozzi, N) [2:24-mj-00005-DB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
42 42 INDICTMENT as to Delanious Ward (1) counts 1-3; Albert Gurley (2) counts 1-3; Agustin Gonzalez (3) counts 1, 4-5; Craig Hunter (4) count 1; David Byrd (5) counts 1, 5; Jorge Mejia-Nolasco (6) counts 1-3; Kevin Yancy (7) count 1; Manuel Greenhalgh (8) counts 1, 4. (Benson, A.) (Main Document 42 replaced on 1/25/2024) (Donati, J).
Related: [-]
43 43 AO257 (Sealed) as to Delanious Ward, Albert Gurley, Agustin Gonzalez, Craig Hunter, Kevin Yancy, Jorge Mejia-Nolasco, Manuel Greenhalgh, David Byrd (Benson, A.) (Main Document 43 replaced on 1/25/2024) (Donati, J).
Related: [-]
44 44 MINUTES (Text Only) for ARRAIGNMENT as to Delanious Ward, Albert Gurley, Agustin Gonzalez, and Manuel Greenhalgh. INITIAL APPEARANCE, ARRAIGNMENT and DETENTION HEARING as to Craig Hunter held on 1/25/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson: All parties present. Mr. Heumann was appointed to represent deft Craig Hunter. The court advised all defts of their rights and the pending charges. A not guilty plea was entered with a jury trial demand by each deft. The govt moved for the detention of deft Craig Hunter. Defense counsel submitted on the matter of detention. After consideration and for the reasons as stated on the record, the court ordered the deft detained. At the request of all counsel, Status Conference was ordered set for 4/25/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The govt moved for a finding of excludable time. Objection by defense counsel for Albert Gurley. Brief arguments heard. After consideration and for the reasons as stated on the record, the court ordered time excluded as to all defendants. XT2 and XT4 Start: 1/25/2024 Stop: 4/25/2024. The Court has been notified that an interpreter is required in this action for Agustin Gonzalez. It is counsel's responsibility to timely notify the Court Staff Interpreter when a hearing requiring an interpreter is scheduled, continued or cancelled. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. See [LINK:LR 403 - Court Interpreter Services in Criminal Actions] The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Government Counsel: Cameron Desmond present. Defense Counsel: Mark Reichel, Betty Williams, Kyle Knapp, Michael Heumann, and Etan Zaitsu present. Custody Status: Defts Gurley and Hunter in custody. All remaining defts out of custody. Court Reporter/CD Number: Rachel Alvarez, ECRO.Spanish Interpreter: Yolanda Riley-Portal, present. (Cannarozzi, N)
Related: [-]
45 45 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) as to Defendant Craig Hunter signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/25/2024: Under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its discovery obligations as required by federal law, including those duties imposed by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions interpreting Brady. This order does not relieve any party of any discovery obligation. The consequences for violating this order or the government's obligations under Brady may include sanctions, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges, among other consequences. (Cannarozzi, N)
Related: [-]
46 46 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy N. Cannarozzi for Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/25/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Craig Hunter is Legs Only (USM # 16418-097). (Cannarozzi, N)
Related: [-]