Hawaii District Court
Judge:J Michael Seabright
Referred: Rom Trader
Case #: 1:24-mc-00058
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2024
Terminated:Jan 25, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM HST
Thursday, January 25, 2024
3 3 order CJA 20 - Appointment Wed 01/31 8:36 AM
CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Stanton C. Oshiro for Defendant Douglas D. Pruett - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/25/2024. Nunc Pro Tunc:1/19/2024. (jtt1)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
1 1 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 01/31 8:28 AM
ORDER Granting Defendant Douglas D. Pruett's Request for Court Appointed Attorney - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN on 1/19/2024. Attorney Stanton C. Oshiro for Douglas D. Pruett added. (jtt1)
Related: [-]