Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10137

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:24-bk-10138
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
InVivo Therapeutics Holdings Corp., Debtor
1500 District Ave
Burlington, MA 01803-5069
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago
Thursday, February 15, 2024
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 02/15 4:58 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by InVivo Therapeutics Holdings Corp.. (McGuire, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 02/15 4:57 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by InVivo Therapeutics Holdings Corp.. (McGuire, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 02/06 6:35 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration Signed on 2/6/2024 (LAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/01 8:15 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10138 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11438976, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 02/01 8:13 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by InVivo Therapeutics Holdings Corp.. (McGuire, Matthew)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Thu 02/01 8:25 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (SH)
Related: [-]