New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Case #: 8:24-cv-00590
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseAttorney Discipline
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Case in other court:Supreme Court of New Jersey, D-92-00022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Respondent
DANIEL M. DIXON
100 PARKER AVENUE UNIT 54
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19128


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Attorney Discipline (NEF to BK/Fin) Tue 03/05 3:01 PM
ORDER that reciprocal discipline is imposed, pursuant to L. Civ. R. 104.1(b)(4), and that DANIEL M. DIXON, be and he hereby is suspended from the practice of law before this Court for a period of one year, effective December 1, 2023, and until further Order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/5/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 03/05 10:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 3/5/2024. On return day of Order to Show Cause for respondent Daniel M. Dixon, Esquire, why the imposition of identical, reciprocal discipline by this Court would be unwarranted and the reasons therefor. No appearance or response on behalf of respondent. Order to be entered. (ar1, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 03/05 3:02 PM
***Civil Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
3 3 service Certified Mail Receipt Returned Thu 02/22 11:39 AM
Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to DANIEL M. DIXON, re2 Order to Show Cause. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 02/01 4:41 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED, pursuant to L. Civ. R. 104.1(b) and Standing Order 2023-01, that respondent show cause, in writing, on or before March 4, 2024 why the imposition of identical, reciprocal discipline by this Court would be unwarranted and the reasons therefor. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/1/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 utility Remark (public) Thu 02/01 10:18 AM
Copy of Order D-92-22 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey suspending DANIEL M. DIXON from the practice of law for a period of one year and until further Order of the Court, effective December 1, 2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]