North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 7:24-cv-00045
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc.
Represented By
John Pierce Marshall
White & Allen, P.A.
contact info
Christopher John Waivers
White & Allen, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Constance Washington
425 Barbey Street
Brooklyn, NY 11207
Represented By
Jonathan B. Salmons
Weaver And Budd Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/16 2:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Constance Washington (Salmons, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 6:28 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan B. Salmons on behalf of Constance Washington. (Salmons, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
14 14 misc Rule 12 Letter Wed 03/20 10:29 AM
Rule 12 Letter Issued as to11 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/13/2024. Sent via US Mail to Constance Washington at 425 Barbey Street, Brooklyn, NY 11207. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
13 13 5 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 03/19 2:16 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc.. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Affidavit Tue 03/19 2:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT regarding11 MOTION to Dismiss by Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Documents received by Defendant
11 11 motion Dismiss Tue 03/19 2:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc.. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 03/19 2:05 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/19 2:02 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher John Waivers on behalf of Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc.. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/19 1:56 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by John Pierce Marshall on behalf of Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc.. (Marshall, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
7 7 notice Document Tue 03/05 1:12 PM
PS Form 3811 Delivery Receipts filed by Constance Washington. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Summons and Letter D.E. 5 and 6,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Wed 02/21 2:35 PM
Letter to Plaintiff regarding Service Requirement. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/20 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Document Tue 02/20 3:17 PM
Civil Cover Sheet filed by Constance Washington. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
3 3 notice Notice of Self-Representation Tue 02/20 2:54 PM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Constance Washington. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/07 12:19 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/7/2024. Copy of order and forms sent via US Mail to Constance Washington at 425 Barbey Street, Brooklyn Kings County, NY 11207. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 02/02 11:21 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure Fri 02/02 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Constance Washington. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 02/02 3:37 PM
Proposed civil deficiency order submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/01 7:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Down East Homes of Beulaville, Inc. (Filing fee $405.00 receipt number 5-00008458.), filed by Constance Washington. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Copy of Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit Copy of email dated 10/16/2022,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Challenge Lien,
Att: 4 Exhibit Copy of email,
Att: 5 Exhibit Copy of complaint from Chowan County (23-CVS-57),
Att: 6 Exhibit Email dated 11/30/2022,
Att: 7 Exhibit Second email dated 11/30/2022,
Att: 8 Exhibit Affidavit Stating Facts on Information and Belief,
Att: 9 Exhibit Copy of Order in Pasquotank County case (23-CVS-174),
Att: 10 Exhibit Copy of Second Contract,
Att: 11 Exhibit Copy of motion for default and entry of default in Chowan County Case (23-CVS-57),
Att: 12 Exhibit Copy of email dated 3/7/2023,
Att: 13 Exhibit Copy of calendar request in Chowan County case (23-CVS-57),
Att: 14 Exhibit Copies of emails and third contract,
Att: 15 Exhibit Copy of Order of Default Judgment in Chowan County Case (23-CVS-57),
Att: 16 Exhibit Copy of email from Constance Washington dated 3/8/2023,
Att: 17 Exhibit Copy of email dated 10/20/2023 and motion to set aside default judgment in Chowan Case (23-CVD-57),
Att: 18 Exhibit Letter from Down East Homes of Elizabeth City,
Att: 19 Exhibit Copy of Certificate of Occupancy,
Att: 20 Exhibit Copy of Order in Chowan County Case (23-CVS-57),
Att: 21 Exhibit Factual Allegations,
Att: 22 Exhibit Letter from Constance Washington,
Att: 23 Exhibit Claim of Lien on Real Property,
Att: 24 Envelope