Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:24-bk-40234
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Plan Confirmed:May 24, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
6275 W Plano Pkwy Ste 500
Plano, TX 75093-4907
Represented By
Robert C. Rowe
Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP
contact info
Mark A. Castillo
Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
316 316 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 2:28 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. Related [+]. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-] 308 Distribution Status Report Filed By Victor Solyanik Filed by on behalf of Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Solyanik, Victor)Modified on 5/6/2025 (pr). filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc., 309 Notice of Substantial Consummation (Subchapter V) Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
Att: 1 Service List
315 315 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 12:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. Related [+]. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-] 314 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing (RE: related document(s)310 Motion for Dissolution of Litigation Trust Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc., 311 Motion for Entry of Discharge Upon Completion of Non-Consensual Commitment Period Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc., 312 Application for Final Decree Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.). Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2025 at 09:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (af)
Att: 1 Service List
314 314 order Expedite Hearing Tue 05/06 10:46 AM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2025 at 09:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (af)
Related: [-] 310 Motion for Dissolution of Litigation Trust Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc., 311 Motion for Entry of Discharge Upon Completion of Non-Consensual Commitment Period Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc., 312 Application for Final Decree Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
Monday, May 05, 2025
313 313 motion Expedited Hearing (Request For Hearing Over 5 Business Days Away) Mon 05/05 6:39 PM
Request for Expedited Hearing On May 27, 2025 Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. Related [+]. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-] 310 Motion for Dissolution of Litigation Trust filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc., 311 Motion for Entry of Discharge Upon Completion of Non-Consensual Commitment Period filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc., 312 Application for Final Decree filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service List
312 312 motion Final Decree (Application For) Mon 05/05 6:37 PM
Application for Final Decree Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service List
311 311 motion Subchapter V (for Entry of Discharge Upon Completion of Non-Consensual Commitment Period) Mon 05/05 6:36 PM
Motion for Entry of Discharge Upon Completion of Non-Consensual Commitment Period Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service List
310 310 motion Generic Motion Mon 05/05 6:33 PM
Motion for Dissolution of Litigation Trust Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service List
309 309 notice Notice of Substantial Consummation (Subchapter V) Mon 05/05 6:28 PM
Notice of Substantial Consummation (Subchapter V) Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service List
308 308 2 pgs misc Certificate of Notice Mon 05/05 6:26 PM
Certificate of Notice of Distribution Status Report Filed By Victor Solyanik Filed by on behalf of Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service List
Thursday, May 01, 2025
307 307 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 11:33 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 297 Order Granting Reorganized Debtor's Expedited Motion (RE: related document(s)289 Application for Approval of Compromise and Settlement Agreement Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement and Mutual Release Agreement # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Service List) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.). (pr)
306 306 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 11:33 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 296 Order Denying As Moot (RE: related document(s)237 Motion to Set Hearing for Determination of Debtor's Disposable Income and Enter Scheduling Order in Connection Therewith Filed by Litigation Trustee of the Western Concrete Pumping Litigation Trust (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Interested Party Litigation Trustee of the Western Concrete Pumping Litigation Trust). (pr)
305 305 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 11:33 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 295 Order Denying As Moot (RE: related document(s)236 Motion to Compel WESTERN CONCRETE TO INCREASE INSIDER PAYMENT ESCROW PENDING DETERMINATION OF DISPOSABLE INCOME ISSUE Filed by Litigation Trustee of the Western Concrete Pumping Litigation Trust (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Interested Party Litigation Trustee of the Western Concrete Pumping Litigation Trust). (pr)
304 304 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 11:33 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 294 Order Granting Motion (RE: related document(s)234 Motion to Release Mediation Escrow Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.). (pr)
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
303 303 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 2:29 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. Related [+]. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-] 301 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing (RE: related document(s)298 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) 1,3,4,6,7,8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,29,30,34,36,37,38,40,43,64 of in the amount of $ Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. ). Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2025 at 09:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (af)
302 302 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service Mailing List Inadvertently not Attached to Motion Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. Related [+]. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-] 299 Request for Expedited Hearing On 05/27/25 Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (RE: related document(s)298 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
301 301 order Expedite Hearing Wed 04/30 9:47 AM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2025 at 09:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (af)
Related: [-] 298 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) 1,3,4,6,7,8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,29,30,34,36,37,38,40,43,64 of in the amount of $ Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
300 300 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 6:56 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. Related [+]. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-] 298 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) 1,3,4,6,7,8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,29,30,34,36,37,38,40,43,64 of in the amount of $ Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc., 299 Request for Expedited Hearing On 05/27/25 Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (RE: related document(s)298 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
Att: 1 Service List
299 299 motion Expedited Hearing (Request For Hearing Over 5 Business Days Away) Tue 04/29 6:32 PM
Request for Expedited Hearing On 05/27/25 Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. Related [+]. (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-] 298 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
Att: 1 Proposed Order
298 298 8 pgs claims Objection to Claim - With Objection Language Tue 04/29 6:29 PM
Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) 1,3,4,6,7,8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,29,30,34,36,37,38,40,43,64 of in the amount of $ Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.(Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 8 pgs Proposed Order
297 297 order Compromise Controveresy Tue 04/29 3:58 PM
Order Granting Reorganized Debtor's Expedited Motion Related [+]. (pr)
Related: [-] 289 Application for Approval of Compromise and Settlement Agreement Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement and Mutual Release Agreement # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Service List) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
296 296 2 pgs order Order on Motion (Generic) Tue 04/29 3:56 PM
Order Denying As Moot Related [+]. (pr)
Related: [-] 237 Motion to Set Hearing for Determination of Debtor's Disposable Income and Enter Scheduling Order in Connection Therewith Filed by Litigation Trustee of the Western Concrete Pumping Litigation Trust (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Interested Party Litigation Trustee of the Western Concrete Pumping Litigation Trust
295 295 order Compel Tue 04/29 3:54 PM
Order Denying As Moot Related [+]. (pr)
Related: [-] 236 Motion to Compel WESTERN CONCRETE TO INCREASE INSIDER PAYMENT ESCROW PENDING DETERMINATION OF DISPOSABLE INCOME ISSUE Filed by Litigation Trustee of the Western Concrete Pumping Litigation Trust (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Interested Party Litigation Trustee of the Western Concrete Pumping Litigation Trust
294 294 2 pgs order Order on Motion (Generic) Tue 04/29 3:53 PM
Order Granting Motion Related [+]. (pr)
Related: [-] 234 Motion to Release Mediation Escrow Filed by Western Concrete Pumping, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Western Concrete Pumping, Inc.
court POrder Note Tue 04/29 9:00 AM
Proposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE:234 Motion (Generic )
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Tue 04/29 9:00 AM
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Tue 04/29 9:15 AM
Proposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE:237 Motion (Generic )
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Tue 04/29 11:15 AM
Proposed Order or Judgment Submitted At Court's Direction RE:234 Motion (Generic )
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Tue 04/29 11:15 AM
Proposed Order or Judgment Submitted At Court's Direction RE:237 Motion (Generic )
Related: [-]