Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Yvette Kane
Referred: Sh
Case #: 1:24-cv-00190
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Defendant
A.J. Taylor
Defendant
Heather Haldeman
Defendant
R.G. Pollock
Defendant
Sharon Clark
Plaintiff
Rashan Mickens

GPO Mar 31 2025
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) RE: 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Heather Haldeman, Sharon Clark, A.J. Taylor, R.G. Pollock. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/31/25. (rw).
GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)IT IS ORDERED THAT:1. Pursuant to the Courts screening authority under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B), the following claims from the complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE:a. Mickenss requested injunctive relief that Defendants be removed from their jobs and disciplined; and b. Mickenss 42 U.S.C. § 1983 (Section 1983) claims for: (1) civil conspiracy; (2) a violation of the Eighth Amendment based on Pollocks alleged use of homophobic, racist, foul, and vulgar language on May 11 and 17, 2023; and (3) monetary damages against Defendants in their individual capacities; 2. Pursuant to the Courts screening authority under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B), Mickenss Section 1983 claim for monetary damages against Defendants in their official capacities is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 3. Defendants motion to dismiss the complaint 10 is GRANTED, and Mickenss Section 1983 First Amendment retaliation claims asserted in his complaint are DISMISSED as follows: a. Mickenss claim against Clark based on her alleged actions in August 2023 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; b. Mickenss claims against Haldeman, Pollock, and Taylor are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and c. Mickenss claim against Clark based solely on her review, investigation, and denial of his grievances submitted on May 17, 2023, and July 27, 2023, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE Defendants Haldeman, Pollock, and Taylor on the docket for this case; 5. Mickens has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. 6. In addition to sending Mickens a copy of this Order and the accompanying Memorandum, the Clerk of Court shall SEND Mickens a copy of the Courts standard form civil rights complaint for prisoners that includes the docket number for this case. Mickens may use this form to file his amended complaint if he chooses to do so; and 7. If Mickens does not timely file an amended complaint in accordance with paragraph five (5) of this Order, the Court will presume that he intends to stand on his original complaint. Mickenss inaction will be deemed as a desire to proceed on the original complaint under the stand-on-the-complaint doctrine, and this Order dismissing the complaint will become final. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/31/25. (rw)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/13 11:34 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sharon Clark.(Greiner, Erich)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
21 21 service AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff Tue 04/29 1:51 PM
AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (rw)
Related: [-]
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/29 1:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sharon Clark, filed by Rashan Mickens.(rw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Monday, March 31, 2025
19 19 3 pgs order Order (Memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) Mon 03/31 1:56 PM
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)IT IS ORDERED THAT:1. Pursuant to the Courts screening authority under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B), the following claims from the complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE:a. Mickenss requested injunctive relief that Defendants be removed from their jobs and disciplined; and b. Mickenss 42 U.S.C. § 1983 (Section 1983) claims for: (1) civil conspiracy; (2) a violation of the Eighth Amendment based on Pollocks alleged use of homophobic, racist, foul, and vulgar language on May 11 and 17, 2023; and (3) monetary damages against Defendants in their individual capacities; 2. Pursuant to the Courts screening authority under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B), Mickenss Section 1983 claim for monetary damages against Defendants in their official capacities is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 3. Defendants motion to dismiss the complaint10 is GRANTED, and Mickenss Section 1983 First Amendment retaliation claims asserted in his complaint are DISMISSED as follows: a. Mickenss claim against Clark based on her alleged actions in August 2023 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; b. Mickenss claims against Haldeman, Pollock, and Taylor are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and c. Mickenss claim against Clark based solely on her review, investigation, and denial of his grievances submitted on May 17, 2023, and July 27, 2023, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE Defendants Haldeman, Pollock, and Taylor on the docket for this case; 5. Mickens has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. 6. In addition to sending Mickens a copy of this Order and the accompanying Memorandum, the Clerk of Court shall SEND Mickens a copy of the Courts standard form civil rights complaint for prisoners that includes the docket number for this case. Mickens may use this form to file his amended complaint if he chooses to do so; and 7. If Mickens does not timely file an amended complaint in accordance with paragraph five (5) of this Order, the Court will presume that he intends to stand on his original complaint. Mickenss inaction will be deemed as a desire to proceed on the original complaint under the stand-on-the-complaint doctrine, and this Order dismissing the complaint will become final. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/31/25. (rw)
Related: [-]
18 18 43 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Mon 03/31 1:50 PM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) RE:10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Heather Haldeman, Sharon Clark, A.J. Taylor, R.G. Pollock. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/31/25. (rw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Mon 11/18 2:09 PM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $83.50 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 11/15/2024. Receipt number 333112457 processed by EP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Wed 10/09 9:57 AM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $21.16 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 10/8/2024. Receipt number 333111937 processed by EP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Tue 09/10 10:06 AM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $29.80 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 9/9/2024. Receipt number 333111543 processed by DJ. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
17 17 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 08/29 11:33 AM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION, re:10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rashan Mickens.(rw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 08/15 10:29 AM
ORDER - 1. The motion (Doc. No.15 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: a. The motion, insofar as Mickens seeks an extension of time to file a response in opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss, is GRANTED; andb. The motion, insofar as Mickens seeks permission to file a response in opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss, is DENIED AS MOOT; and 2. Mickens shall have until September 17, 2024 to file a response in opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/15/24. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Mon 08/12 11:44 AM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $24.49 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 8/9/2024. Receipt number 333111109 processed by CP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time Fri 07/19 12:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Rashan Mickens.(sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter
Friday, July 12, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 07/12 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Rashan Mickens. Database updated. (ma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Tue 07/09 10:21 AM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $28.38 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 7/8/2024. Receipt number 333110606 processed by CP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Thu 06/27 11:25 AM
Letter from Rashan Mickens, RE: documents sent. (rw)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 06/27 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Rashan Mickens. Address updated 6/27/24. (rw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Wed 06/12 10:52 AM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $51.72 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 6/11/2024. Receipt number 333110254 processed by EP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
11 11 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 05/20 10:46 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sharon Clark, Heather Haldeman, R.G. Pollock, A.J. Taylor.(Greiner, Erich)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unpublished Opinion(s)
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Tue 05/07 11:53 AM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $56.72 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 5/6/2024. Receipt number 333109730 processed by DJ. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 05/06 9:01 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Sharon Clark, Heather Haldeman, R.G. Pollock, A.J. Taylor.(Greiner, Erich)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Tue 04/09 9:25 AM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $15.06 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 4/8/2024. Receipt number 333109296 processed by EP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/04 11:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by A.J. Taylor, Heather Haldeman, Sharon Clark, R.G. Pollock. (Greiner, Erich)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 04/04 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erich Thomas Greiner on behalf of Sharon Clark, Heather Haldeman, R.G. Pollock, A.J. Taylor (Greiner, Erich)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Fri 03/22 10:14 AM
Receipt of payment from RASHAN MICKENS in the amount of $39.17 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/Non-Prisoner Installment/CCAM. Transaction posted on 3/21/2024. Receipt number 333109038 processed by EP. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Forms Sent (AO 398 and 399) to Defendants Wed 03/06 10:48 AM
Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to All Defendants Waiver of Service due by 4/5/2024. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Labels
6 6 2 pgs order Order Directing Clerk's Office to Send Waiver of Service Forms Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/06 10:46 AM
ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED; The Clerk of Court is directed to SEND a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Plaintiff is presently confined; The complaint (Doc. No. 1) is DEEMED FILED; SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/6/24. (dmn)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 03/06 10:59 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Courtesy copy sent to PA Office of Attorney General. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
5 5 misc Pro Se Letter Issued - DJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Thu 02/01 1:49 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent,
Att: 2 Instruction Sheet,
Att: 3 Fed and Local Rules
4 4 service AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff Thu 02/01 1:42 PM
AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Thu 02/01 1:41 PM
CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Rashan Mickens. (lp)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/01 1:39 PM
CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rashan Mickens.(lp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/01 1:38 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Rashan Mickens.(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Grievance No. 1033722,
Att: 2 Grievance No. 1034316,
Att: 3 Grievance No. 1044716,
Att: 4 Grievance No. 1049255