District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Emmet G Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00304
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 4:21 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL
Represented By
Demetrios C. Pikrallidas
Pikrallidas Law
contact info
Kristina L. Pywowarczuk
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Cross Defendant
REGINALD ROLAND JOHNSON
Defendant
KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL
Represented By
Demetrios C. Pikrallidas
Pikrallidas Law
contact info
Kristina L. Pywowarczuk
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Defendant
REGINALD ROLAND JOHNSON
Defendant
RASIER, LLC
Represented By
Peter Meredith Moore
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Defendant
UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By
Peter Meredith Moore
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Timothy Stephen Carey
Wilson Elser
contact info
Plaintiff
CAMILA ALEXIA SELMAN
Represented By
Robert F. Muse
Levy Firestone Muse LLP
contact info
Kevin Patrick Crenny
Levy Firestone Muse LLP
contact info
Juliana Andonian
Levy Firestone Muse LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JESUS M. CHRISTIAN
Represented By
Robert F. Muse
Levy Firestone Muse LLP
contact info
Kevin Patrick Crenny
Levy Firestone Muse LLP
contact info
Juliana Andonian
Levy Firestone Muse LLP
contact info
Third Party Defendant
FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By
Daniel Lance Robey
Midkiff Muncie & Ross P.C.
contact info
Third Party Defendant
PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
ThirdParty Plaintiff
KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL
Represented By
Demetrios C. Pikrallidas
Pikrallidas Law
contact info
Kristina L. Pywowarczuk
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info

GPO Mar 17 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/17/2025. (lcegs2)

Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
35 35 21 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 03/17 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/17/2025. (lcegs2)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/17 4:39 PM
ORDER denying18 Motion to Dismiss; granting18 Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying24 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to STAY this case pending the outcome of arbitration. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/17/2025. (lcegs2)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Fri 03/28 1:57 PM
Case Stayed (mac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Manning on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Manning, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 11:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/20/2025. (lcegs1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
32 32 respm Response to motion Tue 02/18 1:17 PM
RESPONSE re31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jason M. Manning, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11484861. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Robey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/18 11:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jason M. Manning, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11484861. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JESUS M. CHRISTIAN, CAMILA ALEXIA SELMAN.(Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Appendix,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 18, 2024
30 30 5 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 11/18 2:07 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re29 Motion for Default Judgment,, filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC. (Moore, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
29 29 motion Default Judgment Mon 11/04 9:11 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Reginald Roland Johnson by JESUS M. CHRISTIAN, CAMILA ALEXIA SELMAN.(Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Appendix Index of Exhibits,
Att: 4 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Video Captures,
Att: 6 Exhibit Traffic Violations,
Att: 7 Exhibit Photographs,
Att: 8 Exhibit Statements,
Att: 9 Exhibit Christian Academic Materials,
Att: 10 Exhibit Text Messages,
Att: 11 Exhibit Expert Resumes,
Att: 12 Exhibit Christian Medical Records,
Att: 13 Exhibit Selman Medical Records,
Att: 14 Exhibit Selman Academic Materials,
Att: 15 Exhibit Samsung Emails
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
28 28 misc Clerks Entry of Default Tue 09/24 10:44 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to REGINALD ROLAND JOHNSON (zdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
27 27 misc Affidavit for Default Mon 09/23 12:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by JESUS M. CHRISTIAN, CAMILA ALEXIA SELMAN.(Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Military Affidavit
Thursday, June 06, 2024
26 26 respm Response to motion Thu 06/06 12:39 PM
RESPONSE re24 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Moore, Peter)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/06 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Meredith Moore on behalf of RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Moore, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
24 24 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/24 3:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by JESUS M. CHRISTIAN, CAMILA ALEXIA SELMAN.(Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Surreply,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 10, 2024
23 23 respm Response to motion Fri 05/10 2:52 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re18 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND RASIER LLCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Carey, Timothy) Modified docket text on 5/10/2024 (zdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
22 22 respm Response to motion Mon 04/29 9:12 AM
RESPONSE re18 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS MOTION to Dismiss filed by FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Robey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
21 21 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 04/26 12:48 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re18 Motion to Compel,, Motion to Dismiss, filed by JESUS M. CHRISTIAN, CAMILA ALEXIA SELMAN.(Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A - Christian Decl.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Rey Decl.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. C - Selman Decl.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. D - Luong Decl.,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. E - Wells Decl.
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/24 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Patrick Crenny on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Crenny, Kevin) Modified on 4/24/2024; replaced fillable document (zdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Fri 03/22 3:12 PM
ANSWER to10 Third Party Complaint by FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Related document:8 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL.(Robey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/21 10:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/21/2024. (lceg1)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
18 18 motion Compel Fri 03/15 5:14 PM
MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(Carey, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit G,
Att: 11 Exhibit H,
Att: 12 Exhibit I,
Att: 13 Exhibit J,
Att: 14 Exhibit K
Friday, March 01, 2024
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/01 3:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Timothy S. Carey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10726304. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(Carey, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 03/01 2:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. REGINALD ROLAND JOHNSON served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024 (Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/01 11:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 motion to extend time. The following deadlines shall govern this matter: (1) Uber Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration shall be filed by no later than March 15, 2024; (2) Plaintiffs' Opposition shall be filed by no later than April 26, 2024; (3) Uber Defendants' Reply shall be filed by no later than May 10, 2024; (4) Uber Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Complaint, if necessary shall be filed by no later than 15 days following an Order denying to stay or dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/1/2024. (lcegs1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/01 12:22 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Uber Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration due by 03/15/2024. Plaintiffs' Opposition due by 04/26/2024. Uber Defendants' Reply due by 05/10/2024. (mac)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/01 2:19 PM
ORDER denying15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Carey has failed to provide a certificate of good standing as required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/1/2024. (lcegs1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/29 5:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Timothy S. Carey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10723657. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.(Carey, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/29 4:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.(Carey, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
13 13 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 02/27 8:26 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (zdp) Modified on 2/27/2024 (znmw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error Tue 02/27 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding13 Summons Issued Electronically,11 Request for Summons to Issue,12 Request for Summons to Issue. The following error(s) need correction: Other- Incorrect summonses provided and issued. Please refile using correct Third-Party Summons. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
12 12 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Mon 02/26 4:50 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY filed by KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL.(Pikrallidas, Demetrios)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Mon 02/26 4:48 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed by KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL. Related document:10 Third Party Complaint filed by KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL.(Pikrallidas, Demetrios)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 02/26 4:21 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed by KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL.(Pikrallidas, Demetrios)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Demetrios C. Pikrallidas on behalf of KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL (Pikrallidas, Demetrios)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Mon 02/26 2:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Defendant Ichinkhorol , Cross CROSSCLAIM against REGINALD ROLAND JOHNSON by KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL.(Pywowarczuk, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/14 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Muse on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Muse, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Thu 02/08 2:40 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL served on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024 (Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Thu 02/08 2:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RASIER, LLC served on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024 (Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Thu 02/08 2:36 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC served on 2/6/2024, answer due 2/27/2024 (Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
3 3 order Standing Order Wed 02/07 10:37 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/07/24. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 02/05 10:14 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KHALINMANDAKH ICHINKHOROL, REGINALD ROLAND JOHNSON, RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.(zrtw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/05 10:07 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zrtw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/01 2:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10661173) filed by JESUS M CHRISTIAN, CAMILA ALEXIA SELMAN.(Andonian, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons