Arizona District Court
Judge:Angela M Martinez
Case #: 4:24-cv-00055
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Case in other court:Pima County Superior Court, C20236002
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 1:18 AM MST
Defendant
Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By
Ryan John McCarthy
Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC
contact info
Brian John Ripple
Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC
contact info
Josh Michael Snell
Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Wade Simmons
Represented By
Mick Levin
Mick Levin PLC
contact info
Bryan Eric Schiller
Schiller Law - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
45 45 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/07 12:28 PM
ORDERED that the Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Complete Two Depositions and Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (Doc.44 .) The Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. 34) is amended as follows: The parties shall have until June 16, 2025 to complete the two delayed depositions. The deadline to file dispositive motions is July 31, 2025. Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 5/7/25. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
44 44 misc Stipulation Mon 05/05 11:47 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO COMPLETE TWO DEPOSITIONS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re:10 Order,, Set Deadlines, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Snell, Josh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Deposition Mon 03/10 5:12 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Juve Gonzalez, filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 02/21 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
41 41 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 01/31 3:45 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of J Daniel Campbell, filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 01/30 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of Deposition Tue 12/17 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Juve Gonzalez, filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Deposition Tue 12/17 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Chris Khavari, filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Report - Status Tue 12/17 9:54 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Deposition Tue 12/17 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of J Daniel Campbell, filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 12/11 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 12/05 9:27 AM
ORDERED that the Stipulation of Extension of Time for Specific Pending Deadlines is GRANTED. (Doc.33 .) The deadline for Plaintiff to submit his expert opinion report is extended to December 15, 2024, and the deadline for Defendant to produce the identity and opinion of its expert is extended to January 31, 2025. Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 12/4/24. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation Wed 11/27 12:27 PM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Specific Pending Deadlines by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 11/04 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Deposition Mon 10/21 1:14 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Michael Wade Simmons, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 10/17 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 10/17 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of Michael Wade Simmons, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/27 11:48 AM
ORDER granting27 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. The Court's Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Complete Discovery due by 4/1/2025. Dispositive motions due by 5/15/2025. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2025. Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 9/27/24. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation Thu 09/26 2:25 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Snell, Josh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion DL
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 09/18 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Deposition Wed 09/18 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Paul Stefanson, filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 09/18 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 08/15 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
22 22 minute_ord ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Mon 08/05 3:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to the appointment of a new District Judge in the Tucson Division, this case is hereby reassigned by the Clerk to the Honorable District Judge Angela M Martinez. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-24-55-TUC-AMM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 07/29 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 07/08 10:39 AM
ORDER granting19 Stipulation: The Parties must comply with the terms of their Stipulated Confidential Agreement (Doc. 19-1). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/3/2024. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 07/03 9:24 AM
STIPULATION for Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 28, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 06/28 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 05/22 8:25 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Subpoenas Duces Tecum
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 05/15 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 05/13 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 04/05 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 04/03 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 04/02 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 03/26 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
10 10 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/13 8:49 AM
ORDER: All Discovery due by 9/30/2024; Dispositive motions due by 10/30/2024; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2024; Joint Settlement Status Report due by 7/12/2024, and every ninety (90) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 3/12/24. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
9 9 minutes Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Tue 03/12 4:50 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held March 12, 2024, before United States District Judge Jennifer G. Zipps. Scheduling conference held. Formal order to follow. APPEARANCES: Mick Levin and Bryan Schiller (appearing by telephone) for the plaintiff: Michael Wade Simmons. Brian Ripple (appearing by telephone) for the defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Court reporter: Linda Parks. Hearing held 3:30 p.m. to 3:42 p.m. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
8 8 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Tue 03/05 10:05 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Michael Wade Simmons. (Levin, Mick)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/26 10:02 AM
NOTICE re: Of Intent to Serve Subpoenas by Auto-Owners Insurance Company . (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
6 6 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 02/12 12:03 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3/12/2024, at 3:30 p.m., before the Honorable Jennifer G. Zipps. The parties are directed to confer at least twenty-one (21) days before the conference. Counsel shall file with the Court, at least seven (7) days before the scheduled conference, a Joint Report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining the discovery plan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties are expected to comply with Rule 26, Fed. R. Civ. P., and to minimize the expense of discovery. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/9/24. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/08 1:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/01 5:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/01 12:58 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (ARC)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Thu 02/01 12:56 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22713274. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-55-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 02/01 12:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20236002. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22713274 filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Ryan)(ARC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, Rule 102a FASTAR Certificate upon Auto-Owners Insurance Company on 1/4/2024. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 1/12/2024) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]
service Service Executed Thu 02/01 12:55 PM
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, Rule 102a FASTAR Certificate upon Auto-Owners Insurance Company on 1/4/2024. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 1/12/2024) (ARC)
Related: [-]