Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Carl J Barbier
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:24-cv-00302
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Case in other court:Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 23-13315
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Mahalie LeFranc Kyzar
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed & Helm LLC
contact info
Devon Bardin McKnight
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed
contact info
Brittney Marie Reed
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed & Helm
contact info
Valerie Briggs Bargas
Kinchen, Walker, Bienvenu, Bargas, Reed & Helm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jim Satel
Represented By
Mahalie LeFranc Kyzar
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed & Helm LLC
contact info
Devon Bardin McKnight
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed
contact info
Brittney Marie Reed
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed & Helm
contact info
Valerie Briggs Bargas
Kinchen, Walker, Bienvenu, Bargas, Reed & Helm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kelly Satel
Represented By
Mahalie LeFranc Kyzar
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed & Helm LLC
contact info
Devon Bardin McKnight
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed
contact info
Brittney Marie Reed
Kinchen Walker Bienvenu Bargas Reed & Helm
contact info
Valerie Briggs Bargas
Kinchen, Walker, Bienvenu, Bargas, Reed & Helm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Unidentified party
Plaintiff
Aaron Spencer
Represented By
Christopher James Williamson
Edward J. Womac, Jr., & Associates, LLC
contact info
Brian J. Branch
Branch Law, LLC
contact info
Joseph G. Lassalle
Joseph Lassalle
contact info
Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Edward J. Womac, Jr., & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Wed 01/29 3:14 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a settlement conference is scheduled for Thursday, August 14, 2025, at 1:30 p.m., before the undersigned magistrate judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties comply with the attached Settlement Conference Guidelines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 1/29/2025. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Settlement Conference Guidelines
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
28 28 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/08 12:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Carl J Barbier. Jury Trial set for 9/29/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Carl J Barbier. All discovery must be completed by 8/5/2025. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 1/7/2025.(amj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
27 27 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 12/17 9:02 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re25 Witness List,26 Exhibit List. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section J and Magistrate Judge Dossier (3). (amj)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
26 26 trial Exhibit List Mon 12/16 3:44 PM
Exhibit List by Aaron Spencer. (Williamson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
25 25 trial Witness List Mon 12/16 3:44 PM
Witness List by Aaron Spencer. (Williamson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 12/13 3:34 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Sallie C. DuPont for American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Henry Satel, Jim Satel, Kelly Satel. Attorney Brittney Marie Reed; Mahalie LeFranc Kyzar and Devon Bardin McKnight terminated. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 12/13/2024. (go)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
23 23 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 12/12 4:21 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sallie C. DuPont to be substituted in place of Devon B. McKnight, Mahalie LeFranc Kyzar, and Brittney M. Reed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Henry Satel, Jim Satel, Kelly Satel.(Bargas, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 12/12 1:21 PM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2025 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone by Clerk. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier.(cg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 11/06 10:49 AM
ORDER granting20 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines pursuant to Rule 16 and to Continue the Trial . ORDER terminating scheduling order deadlines. Case Manager shall contact the parties to arrange a scheduling conference to set a new trial date. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 11/6/2024.(amj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Deadlines Tue 11/05 2:22 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines pursuant to Rule 16 and to Continue the Trial by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Henry Satel, Jim Satel, Kelly Satel.(Bargas, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Relief from Scheduling Order
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/02 4:04 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Henry Satel, Jim Satel, Kelly Satel.Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party Henry Satel(pty:dft).(Bargas, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/01 2:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Henry Satel served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024.(Williamson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
17 17 service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 5:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Henry Satel. (cg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
16 16 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Mon 08/19 10:45 AM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williamson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/05 4:14 PM
FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Jim Satel, Kelly Satel, Henry Satel filed by Aaron Spencer.(cg)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 08/05 4:12 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 8/5/24. (cg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Thu 08/01 12:54 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Aaron Spencer.(Williamson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/24 3:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2025 03:00 PM before Judge Carl J Barbier. Jury Trial set for 3/24/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Carl J Barbier. All discovery must be completed by 1/14/2025. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier.(gla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Monday, July 08, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 07/08 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2024 01:30 PM before case manager by telephone By Clerk. (cg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
10 10 30+ pgs order Order Transferring Case Mon 04/15 2:15 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 04/12/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 03/05 4:40 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Christopher J. Williamson (La. Bar No. 23991) is enrolled in place of Brian J. Branch as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 3/5/24. (cg)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 03/05 8:46 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Christopher J. Williamson to be substituted in place of Brian J. Branch by Aaron Spencer.Attorney Christopher James Williamson added to party Aaron Spencer(pty:pla).(Williamson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 02/16 4:43 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Brian J. Branch (La. Bar No. 30411) is enrolled as counsel of record for Plaintiff in place of Joseph G. Lassalle. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 2/15/24. (cg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
6 6 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 02/15 10:46 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Brian J. Branch to be substituted in place of Joseph G. Lassalle by Aaron Spencer.Attorney Brian J. Branch added to party Aaron Spencer(pty:pla).(Branch, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Wed 02/14 3:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,,, with Jury Demand by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Jim Satel, Kelly Satel.(Bargas, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 02/01 4:13 PM
Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, John Doe, Jim Satel, Kelly Satel re1 Notice of Removal,,,.(Bargas, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Correspondence to Clerk of Court filing MFET,
Att: 2 State Court Motion for Extension of Time
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 02/01 4:07 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company, Corporate Parent AmFam Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company, S.I., Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Company, Corporate Parent AMFAM, Inc. for American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Bargas, Valerie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 02/01 3:56 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl J Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/01 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-13315 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10386802) filed by Jim Satel, Kelly Satel, John Doe, American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company.Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party John Doe(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party Jim Satel(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party Kelly Satel(pty:dft).(Bargas, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Demand,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Medical Records submitted with Plaintiff's Demand,
Att: 6 Consent to Removal by Jim Satel,
Att: 7 Consent to Removal by Kelly Satel,
Att: 8 Affidavit of Valerie Briggs Bargas,
Att: 9 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal