California Central District Court
Judge:Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:24-cv-00892
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Autoaid Collision Inc
Defendant
George-Thomas Enterprises, A General Partnership
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Ignacio Vera
Represented By
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 04/26 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 02/20 4:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera, upon Defendant Autoaid Collision Inc served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Sofer - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/05 11:52 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Autoaid Collision Inc, George-Thomas Enterprises, A General Partnership. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 02/05 11:50 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11C Statement of Consent
Thursday, February 01, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 02/01 2:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 02/01 2:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 02/01 2:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/01 2:43 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36839516 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Ignacio Vera(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]