New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Referred: Sarah L Cave
Case #: 1:24-cv-00735
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Perdomo
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Denise Turner
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodney Willis
22-44 Jackson Avenue Apt. 2709
Long Island City, NY 11101
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
New York City Department of Homeless Services
Terminated: 02/12/2024
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 05/08 12:19 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 111. Mailed to: Rodney Willis 61-55 Junction Blvd. Apt. 24R Rego Park, NY 11374. (vba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
111 111 order Protective Order Tue 05/06 5:18 PM
MODEL CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 5/6/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
110 110 motion Leave to File Document Tue 05/06 10:41 AM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Modified Confidentiality Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Jason Gallant dated May 6, 2025. Document filed by Rodney Willis..(Gallant, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Redline Against Judge Cave's Model Order