Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:24-cv-00132
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC
Represented By
Christian Antkowiak
Buchanan Ingersoll And Rooney
contact info
William P. Lewis
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM CLAYPOOL
Represented By
Kyle H. Steenland
The Workers' Rights Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/24 9:26 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/24/2024. (cjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Mon 07/22 10:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by WILLIAM CLAYPOOL. (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 06/28 3:11 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant shall have through and including July 22, 2024 in which to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/28/2024. (cjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/27 12:53 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by WILLIAM CLAYPOOL by LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC. (Lewis, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 03, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/03 11:05 AM
ORDER granting10 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have until July 1, 2024 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/3/2024. (cjm)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/03 9:51 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by WILLIAM CLAYPOOL by LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC. (Lewis, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 17, 2024
9 9 14 pgs order Order Fri 05/17 5:00 PM
ORDER granting8 Stipulation of Confidentiality and Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/17/2024. (cjm)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulated Protective Order Fri 05/17 10:24 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC. (Lewis, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Confidentiality Undertaking
7 7 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/17 10:16 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC Answer due from LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC on 6/5/2024. (Lewis, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Lewis on behalf of LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC. (Lewis, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Fri 05/03 9:54 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC. (Antkowiak, Christian)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Antkowiak on behalf of LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC. (Antkowiak, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/08 9:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM CLAYPOOL. LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC waiver sent on 3/6/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/01 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC (sdp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 02/01 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against LIBERTY ROOFING PROS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8094692), filed by WILLIAM CLAYPOOL. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet