Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah L Boardman
Case #: 8:24-cv-00334
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Apex Asset Management, LLC
Represented By
Jeremy B Ritter-Wiseman
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Andrew Michael Schwartz
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd
contact info
Patrick K Burns
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Archileen Ayo-Davies
Represented By
Jeffrey W Styles
The Washington Legal Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 06, 2024
31 31 order Order Fri 12/06 5:05 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving30 stipulation of dismissal with prejudice and directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/6/2024. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/06 5:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Archileen Ayo-Davies(Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
29 29 order Order Fri 11/15 8:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER scheduling an on-the-record call regarding the motion to amend16 for Monday, December 9, 2024, at 11 a.m. My chambers will circulate call-in information. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/15/2024. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 08/05 11:31 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time as follows: The scheduling order15 is vacated. Within one week of the Court's resolution of the plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint16 , the parties shall file a joint proposed amended scheduling order. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 8/5/2024. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
order Order Mon 07/29 11:25 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER cancelling the 8/20/2024 settlement conference at the parties' request. The parties are directed to jointly contact my chambers (MDD_TJSchambers@mdd.uscourts.gov) when they are ready to schedule a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 7/29/2024. (bcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time Fri 07/26 4:40 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Adjourn Upcoming Deadlines by Apex Asset Management, LLC(Schwartz, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 08, 2024
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/08 9:18 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (EXHIBIT "C") to Opposition filed by Apex Asset Management, LLC.(Schwartz, Andrew)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/08 9:14 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Apex Asset Management, LLC.(Schwartz, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" HIPAA Disclosure Signed By Plaintiff (redacted),
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" Authorization for Treatment Signed by Plaintiff (redacted)
Friday, June 28, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/28 4:22 PM
NOTICE by Archileen Ayo-Davies re 20 Order, Defendant Opposes Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 06/03 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Michael Schwartz (Schwartz, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
order Order Tue 05/28 11:32 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel to state, as Local Rule 103.6(d) requires, whether the consent of defense counsel has been obtained for the plaintiff's motion for leave to amend. Plaintiff's counsel's statement is due by May 31, 2024. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 5/28/2024. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Tue 05/21 4:21 PM
LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 8/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/21/2024. (bcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/20 4:46 PM
NOTICE by Archileen Ayo-Davies re16 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Redline Version of First Amended Complaint
16 16 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/20 5:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Archileen Ayo-Davies(Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Attachment Redline Version of Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 05/20 11:10 AM
QC NOTICE:16 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Archileen Ayo-Davies was filed incorrectly. **The attached proposed amended complaint and redline state they are for case 24-cv-228. Please re-file the proposed amended complaint and redline with the correct case number using the event Notice (Other) and link it to 16 Motion for Leave to File. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/24 12:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/19/2024. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/24/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/23 3:35 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/23/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 05/02 9:51 AM
Telephone Conference re: Rule 16 held on 4/22/2024 before Judge Deborah L. Boardman. (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/19 11:28 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy B Ritter-Wiseman terminated. Added attorney Patrick K Burns for Apex Asset Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/19/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 corresp Status Report Submitted Fri 04/19 11:08 AM
Status Report Submitted (Joint Status Report in Advance of the April 22, 2024 Conference Call with the Court) by Apex Asset Management, LLC (Schwartz, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/19 10:48 AM
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Apex Asset Management, LLC(Ritter-Wiseman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, April 08, 2024
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/08 11:31 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew Michael Schwartz. Directing attorney Andrew Michael Schwartz to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 4:15 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Michael Schwartz (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11185781.) by Apex Asset Management, LLC(Ritter-Wiseman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Court Admission Dates
8 8 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/04 2:31 PM
LETTER ORDER re: Informal Discovery Dispute Procedure. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/4/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/04 2:28 PM
LETTER ORDER setting conference call for April 22, 2024; Status Report due by April 19 2024. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/4/2024.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 02/26 1:59 PM
[FILED IN ERROR- DUPLICATE] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Apex Asset Management, LLC (Ritter-Wiseman, Jeremy) Modified on 2/26/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/26 1:35 PM
[FILED IN ERROR- DUPLICATE] ANSWER to1 Complaint by Apex Asset Management, LLC.(Ritter-Wiseman, Jeremy) Modified on 2/26/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
4 4 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 1:18 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Apex Asset Management, LLC (Ritter-Wiseman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 1:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Apex Asset Management, LLC.(Ritter-Wiseman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 02/02 9:06 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Apex Asset Management, LLC.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/01 11:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Apex Asset Management, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11065635.), filed by Archileen Ayo-Davies.(Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons