Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:24-bk-30310
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Jun 06, 2024

Debtor
Stephanie Morris Nissan LLC
3815 Northwest Pkwy
Dallas, TX 75225-3501
Represented By
Robert Thomas DeMarco
Demarco-Mitchell, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Daniel J. Sherman
Daniel J. Sherman, Trustee 509 N. Montclair 509 N. Montclair Ave.
Dallas, TX 75208
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 02/02/2024 12:03 AM CST
Thursday, February 01, 2024
crditcrd none Thu 02/01 9:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 7)([LINK 24-30310 7] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A31115232, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer) Thu 02/01 9:19 PM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Stephanie Morris Nissan LLC (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Thu 02/01 9:48 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/12/2024 at 09:20 AM by TELEPHONE. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]