Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00167
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 02, 2024 12:32 AM MST
Defendant
Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya (1)
Represented By
Jared Heath Eggers
Federal Public Defenders Office - Yuma
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lisa Jennis
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/02/2024 1:08 AM MST
Saturday, January 06, 2024
Arrest of Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya on 1/6/2024. (NM) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya. (NM) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(NM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya held on 1/8/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Jared Heath Eggers with Appointment Type: AFPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Defense counsel requests the matter of detention be addressed. The Government requests their three day continuance. The Court sets this matter for detention as stated on the record. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Joseph Nwoga (Duty) for the Government, AFPD Travis O'Neal for Jared Eggers for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Noe Murillo assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 1/11/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. Related [+] Hearing held 1:31 PM to 1:38 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya. (JMA) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Detention Hearing as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya held on 1/11/2024. Defendant ordered released on own recognizance with conditions. Appearances : AUSA Joseph Nwoga (Duty) for the Government, AFPD Jared Eggers for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Noe Murillo assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 11:46 AM to 12:00 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 1/11/24.(JMA) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
8 8 NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (VE) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE re SURRENDER of Passport as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya. Issued by MEXICO. Defendant not permitted to apply for passport/passport card during the pendency of this action. (VE) [2:24-mj-01018-JFM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
10 10 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 with Forfeiture Allegation. Arraignment set for 2/14/2024 at 01:30 PM in U.S. District Court of Arizona, 98 West 1st Street, Yuma, AZ 85364 before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. (KLG)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya. (KLG)
Related: [-]
13 13 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Jairo Andre Rocha-Montoya. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary