Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00189
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 02, 2024 1:26 AM CST
Defendant
Chris Aldo Saavedra (1)
Represented By
Juan Neri, III
Office Of Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tyler Andrew Fleming
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/02/2024 1:58 AM CST
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
Arrest of Chris Aldo Saavedra (drda) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Chris Aldo Saavedra. (drda) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Chris Aldo Saavedra. (drda) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Chris Aldo Saavedra. (drda) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Chris Aldo Saavedra. (drda) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Chris Aldo Saavedra held on 1/8/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/11/2024 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, Interpreter NOT required as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Chris Aldo Saavedra Juan Neri, III for Chris Aldo Saavedra appointed.. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
5 5 NOTICE Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights by Chris Aldo Saavedra (Neri, Juan) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Chris Aldo Saavedra. (Neri, Juan) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Continue as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 1/18/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (aa) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
8 8 MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Chris Aldo Saavedra. (Neri, Juan) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
9 9 ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Continue as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 1/25/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
10 10 MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Chris Aldo Saavedra. (Neri, Juan) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Continue as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 1/26/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Chris Aldo Saavedra. (ic) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Bond by Chris Aldo Saavedra. (ic) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
12 12 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Preliminary Hearing AND Detention Hearing as to Chris Aldo Saavedra held on 1/26/2024, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (Court Reporter FTR Gold- MG Cienega.) (ic) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL; ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to NO BOND as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (1); DENYING ORAL Motion for Bond as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (1). Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00070-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
14 14 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
16 16 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Chris Aldo Saavedra (bot2)
Related: [-]