Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00217
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 02, 2024 1:30 AM CST
Defendant
Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (1)
Represented By
Juan Neri, III
Office Of Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Warsame Ali Khalif Galaydh
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/02/2024 2:05 AM CST
Thursday, January 04, 2024
Arrest of Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (drda) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres. (drda) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres. (drda) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres. (drda) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres. (drda) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres held on 1/8/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/11/2024 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres Juan Neri, III for Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres appointed.. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (Neri, Juan) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights by Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (Neri, Juan) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (bot2) [2:24-mj-00068-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
8 8 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
10 10 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Norlan Guillermo Andino Torres (bot1)
Related: [-]